EP3593844 - MEDICAL MODULE FOR DRUG DELIVERY PEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeScan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRULEVITCH, Peter 1122 Division Street Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | 02 /
WILK, Robert 2482 Bonanza Drive Sierra Village, CA 96126 / US | 03 /
KRAFT, Ulrich Goldgrabenstr. 14 65719 Hofheim / DE | 04 /
SAVAGE, Donna 5268 Willow Wood Road Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274 / US | 05 /
FOLEY, Nick 6 Afton Place Edinburgh, Lothian EH5 4RB / GB | 06 /
GLENCROSS, James 17/1 Links Gardens Edinburgh, Lothian EH6 7JG / GB | 07 /
SHEPHERD, David 23 Ladywell Gardens Edinburgh, Lothian EH12 7LQ / GB | 08 /
SIEH, Zara 487 Montori Court Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | Brunner, John Michael Owen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19191559.4 | 27.01.2010 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | US200915638609P | 27.02.2009 Original published format: US 15638609 P | US200915642109P | 27.02.2009 Original published format: US 15642109 P | US200915647209P | 27.02.2009 Original published format: US 15647209 P | US200916425009P | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 16425009 P | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3593844 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/24, A61M5/31, A61B5/00, // A61B5/145, G01D5/165 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
A61M5/315 (EP,US);
A61M5/178 (CN);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/31 (CN);
A61M5/3129 (EP,US);
A61M5/31525 (EP,US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
A61B5/002 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3126 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3142 (EP,US);
A61M2205/14 (EP,US);
A61M2205/18 (EP,US);
A61M2205/215 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3553 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US);
A61M2205/584 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6054 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6081 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8212 (EP,US);
A61M2209/04 (EP,US);
A61M5/3146 (EP,US);
A61M5/31551 (EP,US);
G01D5/1655 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] |
Former [2020/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES MODUL FÜR WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSSTIFT | [2020/03] | English: | MEDICAL MODULE FOR DRUG DELIVERY PEN | [2020/03] | French: | MODULE MÉDICAL POUR STYLO D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 03.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10746600.5 / EP2401011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5611784 (BARRESI THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9902210 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 2 * abstract * * page 4, lines 1-14 * * page 8, line 16 - page 10, line 31 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 4 *; | [X]US6482185 (HARTMANN MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 2 * the whole document * * figures 5-6 *; | [A]US2004024364 (LANGLEY CHRISTOPHER NIGEL [GB], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document ** paragraph [0029] * | by applicant | US20090156386 | US20090156421 | US20090156472 | US20090164250 |