EP3633539 - METHOD FOR POSITION DETECTION, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | 28.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apollo Intelligent Driving Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 105, 1st Floor, Building 1 No.10, Shangdishi Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/48] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 3/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Mingjian 3/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yucheng 3/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Xun 3/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 04 /
XIE, Shufu 3/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 05 /
ZHAI, Yuqiang 3/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Hao 3/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 07 /
XIA, Tian 3/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19192032.1 | 16.08.2019 | [2020/15] | Priority number, date | CN20181144487 | 07.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811044487 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3633539 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3633539 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06T7/80 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G06T7/80 (EP);
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0251 (US);
G05D1/0274 (US);
G06V20/588 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30256 (EP);
G06T2207/30261 (EP);
G06V20/64 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] |
Former [2020/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONSERFASSUNG, VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2020/15] | English: | METHOD FOR POSITION DETECTION, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE POSITION, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 09.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2018116369 (SOKEN INC, et al)[A] 1; | [XY] - ERNST S ET AL, "Camera calibration for lane and obstacle detection", INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, 1999. PROCEEDINGS. 1999 IEEE/IEEJ/ JSAI INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOKYO, JAPAN 5-8 OCT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991005), doi:10.1109/ITSC.1999.821081, ISBN 978-0-7803-4975-9, pages 356 - 361, XP010369932 [X] 1-3,7,12,13 * §4, §5, §6.2, §6.1, in particular page 357, column 1, second paragraph, page 358, column 2, page 360 column 2, second paragraph, Figures 3, Figure 4, Figure 6 * [Y] 4-6,8-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITSC.1999.821081 | [Y] - WEIGEL H ET AL, "Simultaneous estimation of vehicle dynamics and lane features for road safety applications", INFORMATION FUSION, 2009. FUSION '09. 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090706), ISBN 978-0-9824438-0-4, pages 1512 - 1519, XP031512057 [Y] 4-6 * §6, §3-§3.1, §4 - §4.2.2, equation (14) * | [Y] - XU YUQUAN ET AL, "3D point cloud map based vehicle localization using stereo camera", 2017 IEEE INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM (IV), IEEE, (20170611), doi:10.1109/IVS.2017.7995765, pages 487 - 492, XP033133798 [Y] 8-11 * §V, §III.B;; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IVS.2017.7995765 | [XI] - GOLDBECK J ET AL, "Lane following combining vision and DGPS", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 18, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S0262-8856(99)00037-2, ISSN 0262-8856, (20000401), pages 425 - 433, (20000225), XP008127243 [X] 1 * §2.1, §2.4, §3.1.4, §3.1.5 * [I] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0262-8856(99)00037-2 |