EP3588939 - BUNDLING NIGHT VISION AND OTHER DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEMS (DAS) USING NEAR INFRA RED (NIR) ILLUMINATION AND A ROLLING SHUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mobileye Vision Technologies Ltd. 13 Hartom Street P.O. Box 45157 Har Hotzvim Jerusalem 9777513 / IL | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEIN, Gideon P 18 Shakar Street 96263 Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
BELMAN, Efim 20/11 Karmon Street 96308 Jerusalem / IL | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [2023/42] |
Former [2020/01] | Williams Powell 11 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19192365.5 | 28.10.2011 | [2020/01] | Priority number, date | US201040861710P | 31.10.2010 Original published format: US 40861710 P | US201042142410P | 09.12.2010 Original published format: US 42142410 P | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588939 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3588939 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/58, G06V40/10, H04N23/80, H04N25/531, H04N5/33, H04N23/70, G06V20/56, H04N23/74 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H04N23/70 (EP,US);
H04N23/80 (US);
B60R1/24 (EP,US);
B60R1/30 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP);
G06V20/58 (EP);
G06V40/103 (EP);
H04N23/21 (EP);
H04N23/56 (US);
H04N23/74 (EP,US);
H04N23/951 (EP);
H04N25/531 (EP,US);
H04N5/33 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | H04N5/235, H04N5/33, H04N5/232, H04N5/353, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GEBÜNDELTE NACHTSICHT- UND ANDERE FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEME MITHILFE VON NAHINFRAROTBELEUCHTUNG UND EINEM ROLLING SHUTTER | [2020/01] | English: | BUNDLING NIGHT VISION AND OTHER DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEMS (DAS) USING NEAR INFRA RED (NIR) ILLUMINATION AND A ROLLING SHUTTER | [2020/01] | French: | REGROUPEMENT DE SYSTÈMES D'ASSISTANCE AU CONDUCTEUR EN VISION NOCTURNE ET AUTRES UTILISANT UN ÉCLAIRAGE À INFRAROUGE PROCHE ET UN OBTURATEUR DÉROULANT | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 30.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11187158.8 / EP2448251 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 19.08.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2020 | 19.08.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2020 | 19.08.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2020 | 19.08.2019 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2020 | 19.08.2019 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2020 | 19.08.2019 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2020 | 31.10.2019 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | MC | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SK | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5001558 (BURLEY HARVEY A [US], et al); | [XI]US2005224713 (KOCH CARSTEN [DE], et al); | [A]WO2006060785 (PSC SCANNING INC [US]); | [XI]JP2007174476 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO); | [X]US2010069713 (ENDO AZUCHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US6704621 | US7113867 | US2008137908 | US20100408617 | US20100421424 | EP20110187158 |