EP3751168 - CAST IRON AND CERAMIC COMPOSITE DISC BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laizhou Baoyi Machinery Co., Ltd. Wazi Village South, Tushan Town 261413 Laizhou City Shandong / CN | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOU, Xiaobin No.238, Zaoliyujia Village, Tushan Town Laizhou City, Shandong 261413 / CN | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | ZHAOffice SPRL Rue de Bedauwe 13 5030 Gembloux / BE | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19192386.1 | 19.08.2019 | [2020/51] | Priority number, date | CN201920888037U | 13.06.2019 Original published format: CN 201920888037 U | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3751168 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/12, F16D65/78, F16D65/84 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
F16D65/12 (EP);
F16D65/125 (EP,US);
F16D65/128 (EP);
F16D65/84 (EP);
F16D2065/13 (EP);
F16D2065/1308 (US);
F16D2065/1324 (US);
F16D2200/0013 (EP,US);
F16D2200/0039 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHEIBENBREMSE AUS GUSSEISEN UND KERAMIKKOMPOSIT | [2020/51] | English: | CAST IRON AND CERAMIC COMPOSITE DISC BRAKE | [2020/51] | French: | FREIN À DISQUE EN FONTE ET CÉRAMIQUE COMPOSITE | [2020/51] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 07.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]DD238425 (ZWICKAU ING HOCHSCHULE [DD]) [I] 3-10 * the whole document *[Y] 1,2; | [XYI]WO2007096371 (MAKO SHARK SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1, 2; claims 1, 13-16, 20 * [Y] 1,2 [I] 3-10; | [XYI]CN208185306U (UNIV WUHAN SCIENCE & TECH, et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 6] , [0 15] , [0 23] , [0 30]; figures 1, 4 * [Y] 1,2 [I] 3-10 |