EP3783182 - COMPOSITE FRAME FOR A WINDOW OR DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states profine GmbH Zweibrücker Straße 200 66954 Pirmasens / DE | For all designated states Gest - Holding Gesellschaft m.b.H. Römerstrasse 5 5322 Hof bei Salzburg / AT | [2023/03] |
Former [2022/10] | For all designated states profine GmbH Mülheimer Straße 26 53840 Troisdorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Gest - Holding Gesellschaft m.b.H. Römerstrasse 5 5322 Hof bei Salzburg / AT | |||
Former [2021/08] | For all designated states profine GmbH Zweibrücker Str. 200 66954 Pirmasens / DE | ||
For all designated states Gest - Holding Gesellschaft m.b.H. Römerstrasse 5 5322 Hof bei Salzburg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mutter, Bernd Hintereckstraße 18 66506 Maßweiler / DE | 02 /
Schreder, Gerhard Heitzing 16 4841 Ungenach / AT | 03 /
Speiser, Leonhard Mitterweg 8 4632 Pichl Wels / AT | 04 /
Wohlmuther, Gerold Waidach 260 5421 Adnet / AT | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Hocker, Thomas, et al profine GmbH Patentabteilung Zweibrücker Str. 200 66954 Pirmasens / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | profine Patent Zweibrücker Straße 200 66954 Pirmasens / DE | Application number, filing date | 19192534.6 | 20.08.2019 | [2021/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3783182 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/30, E06B3/54, E06B3/58, // E06B3/263 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
E06B3/306 (EP);
E06B3/5409 (EP);
E06B3/5821 (EP);
E06B2003/26332 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 24.08.2021 | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDRAHMEN FÜR EIN FENSTER ODER EINE TÜR | [2021/08] | English: | COMPOSITE FRAME FOR A WINDOW OR DOOR | [2021/08] | French: | CADRE COMPOSITE POUR UNE FENÊTRE OU UNE PORTE | [2021/08] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 24.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1744001 (SALAMANDER IND PRODUKTE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11 * figures 1, 6, 8c * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraphs [0023] , [ 0025] * [I] 8; | [XI]DE3032939 (SALAMANDER CHEM [DE]) [X] 1-7,9 * the whole document * [I] 10,11 | by applicant | DE10008037 | DE8808313U | EP1914375 | EP1877640 | DE10002658 | EP2594720 | WO2019052987 |