EP3626120 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR STORING AND DOSED APPLICATION OF A LIQUID ON A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herzog-Lang, Viktor Am Märzenbrunnen 9 75210 Keltern / DE | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herzog-Lang, Viktor Am Märzenbrunnen 9 75210 Keltern / DE | 02 /
Heinemann-Grüder, Lucian Obere Dorfstr. 7 75210 Keltern / DE | 03 /
Abele, Artjom Luise Rieggerstr. 7 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | RPK Patentanwälte Reinhardt und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB Grünstraße 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | RPK Patentanwälte Reinhardt, Pohlmann und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB Grünstraße 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 19192922.3 | 21.08.2019 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | DE201810120515 | 22.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018120515 | [2020/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626120 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, B05C11/10, B05C17/00 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
A45D34/04 (EP);
B05C17/002 (EP);
B05C17/00516 (EP);
B05C17/015 (EP);
A45D2200/052 (EP);
A45D2200/056 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2020/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SPEICHERN UND DOSIERTEN AUFTRAGEN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT AUF EINE OBERFLÄCHE | [2020/13] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR STORING AND DOSED APPLICATION OF A LIQUID ON A SURFACE | [2020/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE ET D'APPLICATION DOSÉE D'UN LIQUIDE SUR UNE SURFACE | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 25.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 16.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2008545 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7,13-16 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0037] * [Y] 8-11; | [X]EP1946671 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,13-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0088] * * figures 2-4 *; | [X]US2009038545 (AKAISHI TETSUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,13-16 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0127] , [ 132] *; | [X]WO2007064095 (KANG SUNGIL [KR]) [X] 1,3,12 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]DE102009053291 (EDDING AG [DE]) [Y] 8 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]DE3039415 (LANG APPARATEBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102012109380 (OEKAMETALL OELHORN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0032] * | by applicant | DE102012109380 | DE3039415 | DE102009053291 | WO2007064095 | US2009038545 |