EP3629189 - TECHNOLOGIES FOR USING A HARDWARE QUEUE MANAGER AS A VIRTUAL GUEST TO HOST NETWORKING INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANGAN, John Dromore House Eastpark Industrial Estate Shannon, V14 AN23 / IE | 02 /
MCDONNELL, Niall D. 5 Clifton Close Greystones Limerick, V94 TK5W / IE | 03 /
VAN HAAREN, Harry Apt. 507, Lord Edward Street Limerick, V94 WA09 / IE | 04 /
RICHARDSON, Bruce 24 Cluain Lia, Ballycasey Shannon, V14 P898 / IE | 05 /
LOFTUS, Ciara 30 St. Josephs Park Tuam Galway, H54 NT28 / IE | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19193575.8 | 26.08.2019 | [2020/14] | Priority number, date | US201816144146 | 27.09.2018 Original published format: US201816144146 | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3629189 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3629189 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/173 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
H04L49/9021 (US);
G06F15/173 (EP);
G06F9/546 (US);
H04L49/3036 (EP,US);
H04L49/3045 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] |
Former [2020/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TECHNOLOGIEN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES HARDWARE-WARTESCHLANGEN-MANAGERS ALS EINE VIRTUELLE GUEST-TO-HOST-VERNETZUNGSSCHNITTSTELLE | [2020/14] | English: | TECHNOLOGIES FOR USING A HARDWARE QUEUE MANAGER AS A VIRTUAL GUEST TO HOST NETWORKING INTERFACE | [2020/14] | French: | TECHNOLOGIES POUR UTILISER UN GESTIONNAIRE DE FILES D'ATTENTE DE MATÉRIEL EN TANT QU'HÔTE VIRTUEL POUR INTERFACE DE RÉSEAU HÔTE | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 04.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017195261 (CHOI KANG-IL [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2017286337 (WANG REN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2, 3 , 4, 5 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0038] *; | [I]US2018157520 (CHOI KANG IL [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0045] *; | [I]US2018191630 (KENNY JONATHAN [IE], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1, 2, 7 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056] * |