EP3786498 - SHUT-OFF VALVE FOR A DOUBLE-WALLED LINE, GAS SUPPLY SYSTEM AND LARGE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Winterthur Gas & Diesel AG Schützenstrasse 1-3 8401 Winterthur / CH | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gubler, Aaron Bachtelstrasse 39 8400 Winterthur / CH | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | IPS Irsch AG Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Intellectual Property Services GmbH Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 19193645.9 | 26.08.2019 | [2021/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786498 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/06, F16K27/06, F16L9/18, F02M21/02, F02D19/02, F02D19/06 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
F16K5/0605 (EP);
F02M37/0023 (KR);
F16K5/06 (CN);
F02B25/02 (KR);
F02D19/025 (EP);
F02D19/0613 (EP);
F02D19/0681 (KR);
F02M21/0218 (CN);
F02M21/023 (EP);
F02M21/0242 (EP,CN,KR);
F02M37/0047 (KR);
F16K27/067 (EP);
F16K5/0663 (CN);
F16K5/08 (CN);
F16L23/006 (EP);
F16L39/005 (EP);
F02B2075/025 (KR);
F02D19/0623 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSPERRVENTIL FÜR EINE DOPPELWANDIGE LEITUNG, GASZUFÜHRSYSTEM UND GROSSMOTOR | [2021/09] | English: | SHUT-OFF VALVE FOR A DOUBLE-WALLED LINE, GAS SUPPLY SYSTEM AND LARGE ENGINE | [2021/09] | French: | VANNE D'ARRÊT POUR UNE CONDUITE À DOUBLE PAROI, SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN GAZ ET GROS MOTEUR | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB565902 (CALLENDERS CABLE & CONST CO, et al); | [XI]DE2832505 (SCHNELL GEB EHRICH ROSEMARIE); | [IA]DE10022860 (NEMETZ JOSEF [DE]); | [X]EP2251582 (FISCHER GEORG ROHRLEITUNG [CH]); | [A]US2015316190 (DEVANI FARHAN F [US], et al); | [I]CN106499854 (SHANGHAI MARINE DIESEL ENGINE RES INST); | [Y]DE102016204764 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]); | [Y]WO2018134437 (ELTRONIC AS [DK]) | by applicant | WO2019052624 |