EP3786226 - STABILIZED COMPOSITIONS OF POLYCARBONATES AND VINYLIDENE SUBSTITUTED AROMATIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trinseo Europe GmbH Gwattstrasse 15 8808 Pfäffikon (SZ) / CH | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/21] | For all designated states Trinseo Europe GmbH Gwattstrasse 15 8808 Pfäffikon / CH | ||
Former [2021/09] | For all designated states Trinseo Europe GmbH Zugerstrasse 231 8810 Horgen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Nuffel, Claude T. E. Muizelstraat 16 9041 Oostakker / BE | 02 /
Bouquet, Gilbert Estafetteweg 14 9000 Gent / BE | 03 /
Laurijs, Maurice Jazzroute 36 4337XC Middelburg / NL | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19193760.6 | 27.08.2019 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786226 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3786226 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/32, C08L69/00, C08K5/00, C08L55/02 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
B29B9/06 (US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
B29K2055/02 (US);
B29K2069/00 (US);
B29K2105/0005 (US);
C08K2003/324 (EP);
C08K2201/019 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L55/02, C08L69/00, C08K3/32, C08K5/101, C08K5/134, C08K5/3475, C08K5/3435 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08K3/32, C08L55/02, C08K5/101, C08K5/134, C08K5/3475, C08K5/3435 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON POLYCARBONATEN UND VINYLIDENSUBSTITUIERTEN AROMATISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2021/09] | English: | STABILIZED COMPOSITIONS OF POLYCARBONATES AND VINYLIDENE SUBSTITUTED AROMATIC COMPOUNDS | [2021/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS STABILISÉES DE POLYCARBONATES ET DE COMPOSÉS AROMATIQUES SUBSTITUÉS PAR DU VINYLIDÈNE | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 25.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013203911 (KULKARNI AMIT S [US], et al); | [A]US2013203909 (KULKARNI AMIT S [US], et al); | [XDI]US2014275375 (SUN BIN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2727884 | US3028365 | US3243481 | US3419634 | US3660535 | US4239863 | US4529791 | US4572819 | US4585825 | US4666987 | US4677162 | EP0412801 | US2006036012 | US7001944 | WO2010017067 | WO2011107273 | WO2011110365 | US2013196130 | US2014131241 | US2014275375 | US9028946 | US2018340051 |