EP3786977 - COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEM FOR FORECASTING A DISCONNECTION TIME POINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WPmed GbR Neuhauser Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pressmar, Oliver Neuhauser Straße 3 80331 München / DE | 02 /
Weissenbacher, Ernst-Rainer Herzogspitalstraße 20 80331 München / DE | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19194299.4 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786977 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/4343 (US);
A61B5/7275 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTES VERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHES SYSTEM ZUR PROGNOSE EINES ENTBINDUNGSZEITPUNKTS | [2021/09] | English: | COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEM FOR FORECASTING A DISCONNECTION TIME POINT | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ MIS EN UVRE PAR ORDINATEUR ET SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE PERMETTANT DE PRÉVOIR UN MOMENT D'ACCOUCHEMENT | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014287948 (BONIFACE JOHN JAY [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0100] - [0102] - [0 43] - [0045] - [0 11] , [0 56] *; | [I]WO2016205723 (SERA PROGNOSTICS INC [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0156] , [ 262] , [ 180] , [ 182] , [ 298] , [ 163] , [ 193] , [ 341]; figure 1 *; | [I]WO2019036032 (SERA PROGNOSTICS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 6] , [ 103] - [0109] - [ 192] *; | [A]WO2019068092 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - WEBER ANN ET AL, "Application of machine-learning to predict early spontaneous preterm birth among nulliparous non-Hispanic black and white women", ANNALS OF EPIDEMIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20180824), vol. 28, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.ANNEPIDEM.2018.08.008, ISSN 1047-2797, page 783, XP085523200 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.annepidem.2018.08.008 | [A] - "THE INTERNATIONAL MARCÉ SOCIETY FOR PERINATAL MENTAL HEALTH BIENNIAL SCIENTIFIC CONFERENCE", ARCHIVES OF WOMEN'S MENTAL HEALTH, SPRINGER VIENNA, VIENNA, vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S00737-014-0488-6, ISSN 1434-1816, (20150215), pages 269 - 408, (20150215), XP035471907 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00737-014-0488-6 | by applicant | EP0648335 | US2007015285 | JP2007068839 | JP2009045155 | WO2016131630 |