EP3787014 - DETECTION OF PROCESS PARAMETERS OF AN ASSEMBLY LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanisch, Michael Burghardtstr. 5 16540 Hohen Neuendorf / DE | 02 /
Jarchoff, Kay Nazarethkirchstraße 49a 13347 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Massierer, Jonas Lüdersdorfer Str. 16 16269 Schulzendorf / DE | 04 /
Matiwe, Marco Oettingerstraße 8 12555 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Schubert, Jörg Kurfürstenstr. 82 12105 Berlin / DE | 06 /
Sommerfeld, Dennis Friedrichsbrunner Straße 26 12347 Berlin / DE | 07 /
Wittreich, Ulrich Jacob-Plohn-Str. 10 16727 Velten / DE | 08 /
Wormuth, Dirk Flotowstr. 13 12203 Berlin / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19194361.2 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787014 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/67, B23K3/047, G01K7/42, G01K3/04, B23K1/008, B23K3/08, F27B9/40, // F27D19/00 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
B23K1/0016 (EP,US);
H05K13/0817 (US);
B23K1/008 (EP);
B23K3/08 (EP,US);
B23K37/0408 (US);
H01L21/67173 (EP);
H01L21/67253 (EP);
H05K13/0015 (US);
H05K13/082 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG VON PROZESSPARAMETERN EINER MONTAGELINIE | [2021/09] | English: | DETECTION OF PROCESS PARAMETERS OF AN ASSEMBLY LINE | [2021/09] | French: | DÉTECTION DE PARAMÈTRES DU PROCESSUS D'UNE CHAÎNE DE MONTAGE | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/07] | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2022/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4180199 (ABBOTT WARREN G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 5, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE4330467 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [A] 2 * abstract * * column 3, lines 57-36 * * column 4, lines 36-45 *; | [A]JP2004179461 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE102009003023 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JP2011079055 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP2520393 (ASSCON SYSTECH ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] *; | [X]DE102012217288 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,8-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE102013211834 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0012] *; | [X]DE102015203680 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,8-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 46] , [0 47] * |