EP3595232 - Apparatus and method for transmitting/receiving downlink data channel signal transmission information in cellular radio communication system using cooperative multi-point scheme [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/03] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING/RECEIVING DOWNLINK DATA CHANNEL SIGNAL TRANSMISSION INFORMATION IN CELLULAR RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM USING COOPERATIVE MULTI-POINT SCHEME | ||
[2022/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Hyo Jin 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Youn-Sun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Ki Il 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | 04 /
Ji, Hyoung Ju 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | 05 /
Cho, Joon-Young 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | 06 /
Lee, Ju-Ho 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | [2023/17] |
Former [2020/03] | 01 /
Lee, Hyo Jin 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 16677 Suwon-si / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Youn-Sun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 16677 Suwon-si / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Ki Il 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 16677 Suwon-si / KR | |||
04 /
Ji, Hyoung Ju 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 16677 Suwon-si / KR | |||
05 /
Cho, Joon-Young 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 16677 Suwon-si / KR | |||
06 /
Lee, Ju-Ho 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 16677 Suwon-si / KR | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 19194420.6 | 11.01.2013 | [2020/03] | Priority number, date | KR20120003435 | 11.01.2012 Original published format: KR 20120003435 | KR20120012557 | 07.02.2012 Original published format: KR 20120012557 | US201261600192P | 17.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261600192 P | US201261602741P | 24.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261602741 P | KR20120026248 | 14.03.2012 Original published format: KR 20120026248 | US201261623768P | 13.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261623768 P | US201261625252P | 17.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261625252 P | US201261662534P | 21.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261662534 P | KR20120093328 | 24.08.2012 Original published format: KR 20120093328 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595232 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3595232 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
H04L5/0007 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0035 (KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR,US);
H04L5/003 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0073 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Senden/Empfangen von Datenkanalsignalübertragungsinformationen in einem zellulären Funkkommunikationssystem unter Verwendung eines kooperativen Mehrpunktschemas | [2022/48] | English: | Apparatus and method for transmitting/receiving downlink data channel signal transmission information in cellular radio communication system using cooperative multi-point scheme | [2022/50] | French: | Appareil et procédé de transmission/réception pour des informations de transmission de signal de canal de données de liaison descendante dans un système de communication radio cellulaire utilisant un schéma de transmission multipoint coopératif | [2022/48] |
Former [2020/03] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN/EMPFANGEN VON DATENKANALSIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM ZELLULÄREN FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES KOOPERATIVEN MEHRPUNKTSCHEMAS | ||
Former [2020/03] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING/RECEIVING DOWNLINK DATA CHANNEL SIGNAL TRANSMISSION INFORMATION IN CELLULAR RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM USING COOPERATIVE MULTI-POINT SCHEME | ||
Former [2020/03] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION/RÉCEPTION POUR DES INFORMATIONS DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL DE CANAL DE DONNÉES DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO CELLULAIRE UTILISANT UN SCHÉMA DE TRANSMISSION MULTIPOINT COOPÉRATIF | Examination procedure | 29.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 12.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.10.2022 | 25.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13150976.2 / EP2615765 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 |