EP3786146 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING METHACROLEIN FROM FORMALDEHYDE AND PROPIONALDEHYDE AND PRODUCTION PLANT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Deutsche-Telekom-Allee 9 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Röhm Patent Association IP Management Deutsche-Telekom-Allee 9 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19194665.6 | 30.08.2019 | [2021/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786146 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/75, C07C45/82, C07C47/22 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C07C45/75 (EP,US);
C07C45/82 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/75, C07C47/22 (EP);
C07C45/82, C07C47/22 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHACROLEIN AUS FORMALDEHYD UND PROPIONALDEHYD SOWIE HERSTELLANLAGE HIERFÜR | [2021/09] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING METHACROLEIN FROM FORMALDEHYDE AND PROPIONALDEHYDE AND PRODUCTION PLANT THEREFOR | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MÉTHACROLEINE À PARTIR DE FORMALDÉHYDE ET DE PROPIONALDÉHYDE AINSI QU'INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANTE | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2021/34] | 22.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3213681 (BASF AG [DE]); | [AD]WO2018217963 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) | by applicant | DE3213681 | EP2829531 | WO2015065610 | WO2016042000 | WO2018127963 | WO2018217961 | WO2018217964 |