EP3640179 - DETERMINING ELEVATOR CAR LOCATION USING RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company One Carrier Place Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUDI, Sandeep 5 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT Connecticut 06032 / US | 02 /
BABURAO, Vinay Shimoga Plot No. 324-330 KIADB Industrial Area Hebbal-Hootgalli Mysuru Karnataka 570018 Mysuru / IN | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 19194740.7 | 30.08.2019 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | IN201811032615 | 30.08.2018 Original published format: IN201811032615 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640179 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3640179 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/34 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
B66B1/3492 (EP,CN);
B66B5/0018 (CN);
B66B5/0025 (US);
B66B1/3423 (CN);
B66B1/3453 (US);
B66B5/02 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] |
Former [2020/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DES STANDORTES EINER AUFZUGSKABINE MITTELS HOCHFREQUENZIDENTIFIKATION | [2020/17] | English: | DETERMINING ELEVATOR CAR LOCATION USING RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION | [2020/17] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE L'EMPLACEMENT D'UNE CABINE D'ASCENSEUR À L'AIDE DE L'IDENTIFICATION DE FRÉQUENCES RADIO | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 15.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | MC | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | IE | 30.08.2023 | LU | 30.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | GB | 05.10.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
IE | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
GB | 05.10.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2012031710 (MERI TIMO [FI], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9,10,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0032] * [A] 2,3,11 [I] 8,14; | [XAI]WO2015059821 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-12,15 * figures 2,3 * [A] 6,7,13 [I] 3,8,14; | [XAI]EP3150535 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [X] 1,4,5,9,10,12,15 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] , [0057] * [A] 2,3,6,7,11,13[I] 8,14 | Examination | US2015336768 | JP2018080039 |