EP3787381 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE WITH MULTILAYER LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN BRAND, Jeroen c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 02 /
HARKEMA, Stephan c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 03 /
DE KOK, Margaretha Maria c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | 04 /
VAN DER WAAL, Adri c/o TNO IP & Contracting Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19194775.3 | 30.08.2019 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787381 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02, // H05K3/28 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
H05K1/0274 (EP,US);
H05K3/284 (EP,US);
H05K1/0284 (EP,US);
H05K3/0014 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0108 (EP);
H05K2201/0129 (EP);
H05K2201/09018 (US);
H05K2201/10106 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10121 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT MEHRSCHICHTIGEM LAMINAT | [2021/09] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE WITH MULTILAYER LAMINATE | [2021/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DOTÉ D'UN STRATIFIÉ MULTICOUCHES | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US10288800 (KERÄNEN ANTTI [FI], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9,11-13,15 * column 19, line 23 - column 20, line 48; figure 4 * * column 12, lines 22-45 * [I] 2-4,7,8,10,14; | [A]EP3528602 (TNO [NL]) [A] 3,4,14* paragraphs [0014] , [0021]; figure 2E * |