EP3786726 - ANTIFRICTION SHELL FOR PIVOTING ELEMENTS OF A MECHANICAL TIMEPIECE MOVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valsigna GmbH Via Luganetto 4 6962 Lugano / CH | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kancerevycius, Gitanas Via Orti di Sopra 9 6946 Ponte Capriasca / CH | 02 /
Capiaghi, Gian Paolo Via Cesarea 24 6855 Stabio / CH | 03 /
Janusauskas, Linas Mazvydo str. 4-84 06277 Vilnius / LT | 04 /
Gailevicius, Darius Plytines str. 29-52 10105 Vilnius / LT | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Praxi Intellectual Property Lugano Via San Gottardo, 15 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/41] | Postiglione, Ferruccio Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi Via San Gottardo 15 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [2021/09] | Pasquino, Fabio Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi Via San Gottardo 15 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 19194836.3 | 02.09.2019 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786726 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3786726 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G04B31/06, G04B31/004, F16C17/08, F16C33/04, B33Y70/10 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
G04B31/004 (EP);
B33Y70/10 (EP);
F16C17/08 (EP);
F16C33/043 (EP);
G04B31/06 (EP);
C04B2235/483 (EP);
C04B2235/6026 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] |
Former [2021/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REIBUNGSVERHINDERNDE HÜLLE FÜR SCHWENKBARE ELEMENTE EINES MECHANISCHEN UHRWERKS | [2021/09] | English: | ANTIFRICTION SHELL FOR PIVOTING ELEMENTS OF A MECHANICAL TIMEPIECE MOVEMENT | [2021/09] | French: | COQUE ANTIFRICTION POUR ÉLÉMENTS PIVOTANTS D'UN MOUVEMENT D'HORLOGERIE MÉCANIQUE | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 03.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3164421 (WALTER KOHLHAGEN) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 36 - column 7, line 49; figures 1-13 *; | [A]EP2605086 (ETA SA MFT HORLOGERE SUISSE [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0056]; figure 7a *; | [A]CH708936 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] - [0034] , [0035] , [0039] - [0044]; figures 2-5 *; | [T] - SENIUTINAS G ET AL, "Beyond 100?nm resolution in 3D laser lithography - Post processing solutions", MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180202), vol. 191, doi:10.1016/J.MEE.2018.01.018, ISSN 0167-9317, pages 25 - 31, XP085355371 [T] 1-15 * Sections 1., 2. and 3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mee.2018.01.018 | [T] - ALEKSANDR OVSIANIKOV ET AL, "Ultra-Low Shrinkage Hybrid Photosensitive Material for Two-Photon Polymerization Microfabrication", ACS NANO, (20081125), vol. 2, no. 11, doi:10.1021/nn800451w, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 2257 - 2262, XP055182536 [T] 1-15 * METHODS section * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn800451w | [T] - QUAN SUN ET AL, "Femtosecond laser photopolymerization of photonic and free-movable microstructures in sol-gel hybrid resist", SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING. PROCEEDINGS, US, (20100211), vol. 7591, doi:10.1117/12.840657, ISSN 0277-786X, page 75910K, XP055671591 [T] 1-15 * Sections 2. and 3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.840657 | [T] - MANGIRDAS MALINAUSKAS ET AL, "Ultrafast laser processing of materials: from science to industry", LIGHT: SCIENCE & APPLICATIONS, (20160314), vol. 5, no. 8, doi:10.1038/lsa.2016.133, pages 1 - 14, XP055530724 [T] 1-15 * page 4, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/lsa.2016.133 | [T] - MARIA FARSARI ET AL, "REVIEW ARTICLE;Multiphoton polymerization of hybrid materials;Multiphoton polymerization of hybrid materials", JOURNAL OF OPTICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL GB, (20101111), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.1088/2040-8978/12/12/124001, ISSN 2040-8986, page 124001, XP020202235 [T] 1-15 * Section 7. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/2040-8978/12/12/124001 |