EP3611235 - COATING COMPOSITIONS FOR PACKAGING ARTICLES AND METHODS OF COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWIMC LLC 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | [2024/13] |
Former [2023/11] | For all designated states SWIMC LLC 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | ||
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states Swimc, LLC 101 W. Prospect Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Richard H. 1801 St. James Place Wexford, PA Pennsylvania 15090 / US | 02 /
Niederst, Jeffrey 1101 South Third Street Minneapolis, MN Minnesota 55415 / US | 03 /
O'Brien, Robert M. 163 Ridge Road Monongahela, PA Pennsylvania 15063 / US | 04 /
Prouvost, Benoit 37 Rue de la Bastille 44000 Nantes / FR | 05 /
Schutte, Grant 114 Academy Avenue Pittsburgh, PA Pennsylvania 15228 / US | 06 /
Stenson, Paul 23 Wildwood Drive Avon, CT Connecticut 60001 / US | 07 /
Van Kuren, Tom 206 West Vanderbilt Drive Mars, PA Pennsylvania 16046 / US | 08 /
Romagnoli, Kevin 1101 South Third Street Minneapolis, MN Minnesota 55415 / US | [2023/10] |
Former [2020/08] | 01 /
Evans, Richard H. 1801 St. James Place Wexford, PA Pennsylvania 15090 / US | ||
02 /
Niederst, Jeffrey 1101 South Third Street Minneapolis, MN Minnesota 55415 / US | |||
03 /
O'Brien, Robert M. 163 Ridge Road Monongahela, PA Pennsylvania 15063 / US | |||
04 /
Prouvost, Benoit 37 Rue de la Bastille 44000 Nantes / FR | |||
05 /
Schutte, Grant 114 Academy Avenue Pittsburgh, PA Pennsylvania 15228 / US | |||
06 /
Stenson, Paul 23 Wildwood Drive Avon, CT Connecticut 060001 / US | |||
07 /
Van Kuren, Tom 206 West Vanderbilt Drive Mars, PA Pennsylvania 16046 / US | |||
08 /
Romagnoli, Kevin 1101 South Third Street Minneapolis, MN Minnesota 55415 / US | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2024/13] |
Former [2020/08] | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19195021.1 | 15.04.2011 | [2020/08] | Priority number, date | US201032499710P | 16.04.2010 Original published format: US 32499710 P | US201033313310P | 10.05.2010 Original published format: US 33313310 P | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3611235 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3611235 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09D171/00, C09D171/12, C09D5/00, B32B15/08 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
C08G59/066 (EP,CN,US);
B05D7/227 (KR,US);
C09D171/00 (CN,KR);
C09D171/08 (US);
B05D3/007 (KR);
B05D7/14 (KR,US);
B05D7/24 (KR);
B21D31/00 (US);
B65D25/00 (US);
B65D25/34 (CN);
C08G59/24 (EP,CN,US);
C09D171/12 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] |
Former [2020/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR VERPACKUNGSGEGENSTÄNDE UND BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/10] | English: | COATING COMPOSITIONS FOR PACKAGING ARTICLES AND METHODS OF COATING | [2020/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVÊTEMENT POUR ARTICLES D'EMBALLAGE ET PROCÉDÉS DE REVÊTEMENT | [2020/08] |
Former [2020/08] | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR VERPACKUNGSARTIKEL UND BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN | Examination procedure | 18.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 18.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11769696.3 / EP2558543 | EP17182623.3 / EP3263664 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003203991 (SCHOTTMAN THOMAS C [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0186] - paragraph [0196] ** abstract *; | [X]US2006052523 (BUSHENDORF PAULA [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0086] * * abstract *; | [X]WO2009015493 (ETH ZUERICH [CH], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 8 - page 8, line 8 * * page 9, line 16 - page 12, line 2 * * page 17, line 3 - page 18, line 9 * * abstract * | by applicant | US2633458 | US3943187 | US3997694 | US4076676 | US4247439 | US4283428 | US4285847 | US4413015 | US4446258 | US4476262 | US4517322 | US4963602 | US5296525 | US5527840 | US5830952 | US5922817 | US6034157 | US2005196629 | US7037584 | US7189787 | US2010030584 | US2010030576 | US2010068433 | US7910170 |