EP3623194 - VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Takanori c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
OZAWA, Hiroyuki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 19196442.8 | 10.09.2019 | [2020/12] | Priority number, date | JP20180170796 | 12.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018170796 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623194 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/04 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
B60K1/04 (EP,CN,US);
B60G13/003 (US);
B60G2300/50 (EP,US);
B60G2400/63 (US);
B60K2001/0438 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG | [2020/12] | English: | VEHICLE | [2020/12] | French: | VÉHICULE | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 02.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2018186227 (STEPHENS MARK CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]US2017324128 (MILTON TREVOR R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * * figures 1-3, 7, 8 * * paragraph [0038] * [I] 5,9; | [X]EP2505458 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]US2017001507 (ASHRAF UMRAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9 * abstract * [I] 5; | [XI]US2013153317 (RAWLINSON PETER DORE [GB], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [I] 9 | by applicant | JP2009248708 |