EP3792111 - LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEIDPLAS GmbH Joweid Zentrum 19 8630 Rüti / CH | [2023/25] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states WEIDPLAS GmbH Obere Wiltisgasse 48 8700 Küsnacht / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEFELEIN, Carsten Dianastr. 58 85540 Haar / DE | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Rutz, Andrea Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19196673.8 | 11.09.2019 | [2021/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792111 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3792111 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, F21S43/14, F21S43/239, F21S43/20 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0052 (EP);
F21S43/14 (EP);
F21S43/239 (EP);
F21S43/26 (EP);
F21W2103/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTE | [2021/11] | English: | LAMP | [2021/11] | French: | LUMINAIRE | [2021/11] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 20.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 25.10.2023 | |
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2220145 (LESTER COOKE HEREWARD) [X] 1-8,12,15-18* page 3, column 1, lines 26-40; figures 1-8; claims 1-5 *; | [X]JP2003317512 (MARUISHI CYCLE IND LTD) [X] 1-7,12,15-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0013] - [0016]; figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [X]US6837602 (LEE JIHN-SHIUN [TW]) [X] 1-8,10-12,15-18 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 20; figures 1-15; claims 1-4 *; | [X]US2006083016 (OKAMURA TAKEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,10-18 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0039] , [0042]; figures 1-8; claims 1-20 *; | [X]EP3326863 (WEIDPLAS GMBH [CH]) [X] 1-9,12-15,17,18 * paragraphs [0055] , [0070] - [0073] - [0089] - [0095] - [0104] - [0109] - [0117] - [0122]; figures 1-10; claims 1-15 *; | [X]WO2019015829 (WEIDPLAS GMBH [CH]) [X] 1-15,17,18 * page 13, line 29 - page 18, line 14; figures 1-9; claims 1-18 * | Examination | DE2062472 | US4558401 | EP3431863 | by applicant | EP2853806 | WO2017174548 | DE102018112122 |