EP3792653 - LASER SCANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIEGL Laser Measurement Systems GmbH Riedenburgstraße 48 3580 Horn / AT | [2022/04] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Riegl Laser Measurement Systems GmbH Riedenburgstraße 48 3580 Horn / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHERT, Rainer Hoyosgasse 18 3580 Horn / AT | 02 /
RIEGER, Peter Hauptstrasse 1 3824 Grossau / AT | 03 /
PFENNIGBAUER, Martin Frauentorgasse 42 3430 Tulln / AT | 04 /
RIEGL, Johannes Trabenreith 35 3754 Trabenreith / AT | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Weiser & Voith Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Kopfgasse 7 1130 Wien / AT | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19196895.7 | 12.09.2019 | [2021/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792653 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3792653 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/12, G01S7/481, G02B5/09 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
G01S7/4817 (EP,CN,US);
G01S7/4812 (EP,CN);
G01S7/4816 (EP,CN);
G02B26/12 (EP,CN);
G02B5/09 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/02027 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | G01S7/481, G02B26/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | LASERSCANNER | [2021/11] | English: | LASER SCANNER | [2021/11] | French: | LECTEUR LASER | [2021/11] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 24.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2019 | AL | 26.01.2022 | CY | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | DK | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | ES | 26.01.2022 | FI | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | IT | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | MK | 26.01.2022 | NL | 26.01.2022 | PL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SE | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | IE | 12.09.2022 | LU | 12.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 12.09.2019 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/31] | NL | 26.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP2293013 (RIEGL LASER MEASUREMENT SYS [AT]) [YD] 11,12,14 * paragraph [0031]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0005] *; | [Y]AT512768 (RIEGL LASER MEASUREMENT SYS [AT]) [Y] 13* paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figure 1 *; | [IDY]EP3182159 (RIEGL LASER MEASUREMENT SYSTEMS GMBH [AT]) [ID] 1-4,10 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0062]; figures 3-12 * [Y] 5,9,11,12,14; | [Y]US2018017668 (COTTIN PIERRE [CA], et al) [Y] 5,9 * paragraph [0133]; figure 12 *; | [XAYI]CN207020306U (EXAMING & EXPERIMENTAL CT ULTRAHIGH VOLTAGE POWER TRANS CO CHINA SOUTHEN POWER GRID CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033]; figure 3 * [A] 6,8 [Y] 5,11,12,14 [I] 3,4,7,9; | [XY]KR20180089625 (SOS LAB CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,10-12,14 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0060]; figures 6-20 * [Y] 5,9,13 | by applicant | EP2293013 | EP2622364 | EP3182159 |