EP3623637 - CENTRIFUGAL FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yen Sun Technology Corp. No. 329, Fongren Road Renwu District Kaohsiung City 81449 / TW | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Chien-Jung No. 329, Fongren Rd., Renwu Dist. 81449 KAOHSIUNG CITY / TW | 02 /
HSU, Chih-Tsung No. 20, Yongxin 4th St., Renwu Dist. 81449 KAOHSIUNG CITY / TW | 03 /
WU, Hsin-Hsien No. 43, Lane 568, Daji Rd., Dashe Dist. 81544 KAOHSIUNG CITY / TW | 04 /
WU, Chan- Yi No. 329, Fongren Rd., Renwu Dist. 81449 KAOHSIUNG CITY / TW | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 19196942.7 | 12.09.2019 | [2020/12] | Priority number, date | TW20180132408 | 14.09.2018 Original published format: TW 107132408 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623637 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/28, F04D29/30, F04D29/66 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
F04D29/30 (EP);
F04D29/281 (EP,US);
F04D29/666 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALGEBLÄSE | [2020/12] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL FAN | [2020/12] | French: | VENTILATEUR CENTRIFUGE | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 12.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2018127970 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * figures 1-10b * [I] 2,3; | [XI]US2014127022 (CHENG YI-LUN [TW], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 1-3b * [I] 2,3; | [X]EP1253325 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [X] 6,7 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 2-6 *; | [X]DE165330 (UNKNOWN) [X] 6,7 * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 59 * * figure 1 * |