EP3643672 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE BIAS FORCE OF A DRIVE BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech Antriebssysteme GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2021/29] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states ContiTech Antriebssysteme GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartsch-Kuszewski, Dirk c/o ContiTech Antriebssysteme GmbH Vahrenwalder Str. 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental AG Intellectual Property Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [2021/29] |
Former [2020/18] | Kilsch, Armin Ralph Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 19197644.8 | 17.09.2019 | [2020/18] | Priority number, date | DE201810218161 | 24.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018218161 | [2020/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643672 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3643672 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B66B7/06, F16H7/08 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
F16H7/08 (EP);
B66B7/062 (EP);
F16H2007/0808 (EP);
F16H2007/0865 (EP);
F16H2007/0876 (EP);
F16H2007/0887 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] |
Former [2020/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER VORSPANNUNGSKRAFT EINES ANTRIEBSRIEMENS | [2020/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE BIAS FORCE OF A DRIVE BELT | [2020/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE LA FORCE DE PRÉCONTRAINTE D'UNE COURROIE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 29.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2019 | AL | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | ES | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | IT | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | NL | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | TR | 21.07.2021 | IE | 17.09.2021 | LU | 17.09.2021 | FR | 21.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 17.09.2019 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
MK | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
FR | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 17.09.2019 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
FR | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
FR | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
IT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
FR | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
IE | 17.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
FR | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 17.09.2021 | ||
FR | 21.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 21.07.2021 | |
ES | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 21.07.2021 | |
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1700810 (TUEV RHEINLAND IND SERVICE GMB [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,10-16 * paragraphs [0003] , [0023] , [0043]; figures 4,13; claim 11 *; | [X]EP2017594 (MYTRAK HEALTH SYSTEM INC [CA]) [X] 1-4,13-16* paragraphs [0008] , [0009]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2012031361 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,13 * paragraph [0044]; figure 1a * | by applicant | DE3333710 |