EP3795731 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ORIENTATION OF FIBERS OF A NONWOVEN FABRIC AND FIBER ORIENTATION MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gottfried Wilhelm Leibniz Universität Hannover Welfengarten 1 30167 Hannover / DE | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRICKE, Dierk Zietenstraße 2A 30163 Hannover / DE | 02 /
BECKER, Alexander Wilhelmstrasse 30 32175 Lehrte / DE | 03 /
ROTH, Bernhard Vahlkamp 44 33719 Bielefeld / DE | 04 /
GLASMACHER, Birgit Alte Herrenhäuser Straße 38 30419 Hannover / DE | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/12] | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Straße 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 19197842.8 | 17.09.2019 | [2021/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3795731 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3795731 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/728, D01D5/00, G01B11/26, G01B11/27, G01N21/21, G01N21/898 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G01N21/8915 (EP);
D04H1/728 (EP);
G01N21/21 (EP);
D01D5/0007 (EP);
G01N2021/8444 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER ORIENTIERUNG VON FASERN EINES VLIESES UND FASERORIENTIERUNGS-MESSGERÄT | [2021/12] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ORIENTATION OF FIBERS OF A NONWOVEN FABRIC AND FIBER ORIENTATION MEASURING DEVICE | [2021/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE ORIENTATION DES FIBRES D'UN NON TISSÉ ET APPAREIL DE MESURE DE L'ORIENTATION DES FIBRES | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 02.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4730931 (WATSON ROBERT L [US]); | [X]DE69418505T (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]); | [XI]US7289211 (WALSH JR JOSEPH T [US], et al); | [A]DE102011001106 (UNIV GRAZ TECH [AT]); | [XAI]JP2015033587 (FUJIFILM CORP) |