EP3632485 - TREATING CONGESTIVE HEART FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, MN 55905 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASIRVATHAM, Samuel, J. 6550 Highway 63 North Rochester, MN 55906 / US | 02 /
PARK, Soon, J. 471 Bay Village Dr. Rochester, NY 14609 / US | 03 /
FRIEDMAN, Paul, A. 1408 Woodland Drive S.W. Rochester, MN 55092 / US | 04 /
BRUCE, Charles, J. 413 Eagle Lane S.W. Rochester, MN 55902 / US | 05 /
KUSHWAHA, Sudhir, S. 1486 Seasons Lane S.W. Rochester, MN 55902 / US | [2023/34] |
Former [2020/15] | 01 /
ASIRVATHAM, Samuel, J. 6550 Highway 63 North Rochester, MN Minnesota 55906 / US | ||
02 /
PARK, Soon, J. 471 Bay Village Dr. Rochester, NY 14609 / US | |||
03 /
FRIEDMAN, Paul, A. 1408 Woodland Drive S.W. Rochester, MN Minnesota 55092 / US | |||
04 /
BRUCE, Charles, J. 413 Eagle Lane S.W. Rochester, MN Minnesota 55902 / US | |||
05 /
KUSHWAHA, Sudhir, S. 1486 Seasons Lane S.W. Rochester, MN Minnesota 55902 / US | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2024/01] |
Former [2020/15] | Ammelburg, Jan Moritz c/o Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19197851.9 | 11.05.2010 | [2020/15] | Priority number, date | US200917707509P | 11.05.2009 Original published format: US 17707509 P | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632485 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3632485 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M60/148, A61M60/279, A61M60/414, A61M60/165, A61M60/20, A61M60/515, A61M60/867, A61M29/02 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A61N1/3962 (EP,US);
A61M60/165 (EP,US);
A61M60/20 (EP,US);
A61M60/279 (EP,US);
A61M60/515 (EP,US);
A61M60/867 (EP,US);
A61M2205/33 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3303 (EP,US);
A61M60/148 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | A61M1/12, A61M29/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] |
Former [2020/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG KONGESTIVER HERZINSUFFIZIENZ | [2020/15] | English: | TREATING CONGESTIVE HEART FAILURE | [2020/15] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE CONGESTIVE | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 06.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10775405.3 / EP2429603 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.12.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 17.09.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2020 | 17.09.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2020 | 17.09.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2020 | 17.09.2019 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2020 | 17.09.2019 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2020 | 17.09.2019 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2020 | 17.09.2019 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2020 | 17.09.2019 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0445782 (MISUZU IND CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 41 *; | [A]US6136025 (BARBUT DENISE R [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * sentence 39, paragraph 6 - sentence 61, paragraph 7 *; | [A]WO2008027869 (CIRCULITE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0031] , [0034] - [0037]; figures 1a-1h,2 * | Examination | WO2005037345 | US2006155158 | by applicant | US4753221 | US4919647 | US6926662 | US2005187425 | US2006181843 | US2007156010 | WO2008002471 |