EP3626844 - METHOD FOR SELECTIVE RECOVERY OF AT LEAST ONE RARE EARTH PRESENT IN WASTE AND WASTE RECOVERY METHOD IMPLEMENTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLY, Emmanuel CEA GRENOBLE 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 02 /
BARTHELEMY, Sandrine CEA GRENOBLE 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/32] |
Former [2020/13] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19197931.9 | 18.09.2019 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | FR20180058509 | 20.09.2018 Original published format: FR 1858509 | [2020/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626844 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3626844 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22B7/00, C22B59/00 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
C22B59/00 (EP);
C22B7/007 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN RÜCKGEWINNUNG MINDESTENS EINER SELTENEN ERDE, DIE IN EINEM ABFALL ENTHALTEN IST, UND VALORISIERUNGSVERFAHREN EINES ABFALLS, BEI DEM DIESES VERFAHREN ANGEWENDET WIRD | [2020/13] | English: | METHOD FOR SELECTIVE RECOVERY OF AT LEAST ONE RARE EARTH PRESENT IN WASTE AND WASTE RECOVERY METHOD IMPLEMENTING SAME | [2020/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION SÉLECTIVE D'AU MOINS UNE TERRE RARE PRÉSENTE DANS UN DÉCHET ET PROCÉDÉ DE VALORISATION D'UN DÉCHET LE METTANT EN OEUVRE | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | IE | 18.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
IE | 18.09.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0790322 (SANTOKU METAL IND [JP]); | [A]EP2444507 (MONTANUNIV LEOBEN [AT]); | [A]KR20170056870 (A M C CO LTD [KR]); | by applicant | US5429887 | EP0790322 |