EP3637544 - AIRCRAFT ANTENNA MOUNTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLACE, Michael G. c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 19198129.9 | 18.03.2014 | [2020/16] | Priority number, date | US201313859465 | 09.04.2013 Original published format: US201313859465 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3637544 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/12, H01Q1/28 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
H01Q1/28 (EP,US);
H01Q1/12 (EP,US);
H01Q1/42 (US);
Y10T29/49016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGANTENNENMONTAGESYSTEM | [2020/16] | English: | AIRCRAFT ANTENNA MOUNTING SYSTEM | [2020/16] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MONTAGE D'ANTENNE D'AÉRONEF | [2020/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/12] | 05.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14160605.3 / EP2790267 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010315301 (MARTEN RANDY C [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10,11 * figures 6,7,11,15 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * [I] 6,9,14,15; | [A]US2009034475 (RUNYON DONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] *; | [A]US2011279337 (CORWIN ROBERT MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0033] *; | [A]US2012188143 (YANG TAE HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,5 * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]US7786937 (STIERHOFF WALTER G [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 8 *; | [A]US2011282521 (VLAD OVIDIU GABRIEL [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0066] * |