EP3623794 - A MICROFLUIDIC DETECTION SYSTEM AND A MICROFLUIDIC CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoetis Denmark Aps Gammelgårdsvej 87 C 3520 Farum / DK | [2022/09] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states Zoetis Denmark Aps Gammelgårdsvej 87 C 3520 Farum / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAU-MADSEN, Niels Kristian c/o Gammelgårdsvej 87 C 3520 Farum / DK | 02 /
NIELSEN, Lars, Bue c/o Gammelgårdsvej 87 C 3520 Farum / DK | 03 /
HELLER, Martin c/o Gammelgårdsvej 87 C 3520 Farum / DK | 04 /
KRING, Ole c/o Gammelgårdsvej 87 C 3520 Farum / DK | 05 /
ORDEIG, Olga c/o Gammelgårdsvej 87 C 3520 Farum / DK | 06 /
OVERBY, Bent c/o Gammelgårdsvej 87 C 3520 Farum / DK | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2022/09] |
Former [2020/12] | Hegner, Anette Hegner & Partners A/S Symbion Science Park Fruebjergvej 3 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Application number, filing date | 19198299.0 | 15.06.2015 | [2020/12] | Priority number, date | DK2014PA70363 | 18.06.2014 Original published format: DK PA201470363 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623794 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3623794 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, G01N21/05, B01L3/00, G01N35/00, A61B5/145, G01N15/14, G01N21/64, G01N21/25, G01N21/31, B01L9/00 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
B01L9/527 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/6428 (KR,US);
B01L3/502715 (US);
G01N21/05 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/25 (US);
G01N21/255 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (EP,KR,US);
G01N27/403 (US);
G01N35/00029 (EP,US);
G01N35/00732 (US);
B01L2200/025 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/02 (US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/0654 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (US);
G01N2021/0346 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/6439 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2035/00237 (US);
G01N2035/00752 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2035/00811 (US);
G01N2035/00851 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/648 (EP);
G01N2201/062 (US);
G01N2201/0627 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2020/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHES DETEKTIONSSYSTEM UND EINE MIKROFLUIDISCHE KARTUSCHE | [2020/12] | English: | A MICROFLUIDIC DETECTION SYSTEM AND A MICROFLUIDIC CARTRIDGE | [2020/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION MICROFLUIDIQUE ET UNE CARTOUCHE MICROFLUIDIQUE | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 18.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15810324.2 / EP3158317 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2015 | AL | 02.03.2022 | CY | 02.03.2022 | CZ | 02.03.2022 | DK | 02.03.2022 | EE | 02.03.2022 | FI | 02.03.2022 | HR | 02.03.2022 | LT | 02.03.2022 | LV | 02.03.2022 | MC | 02.03.2022 | MK | 02.03.2022 | PL | 02.03.2022 | RO | 02.03.2022 | RS | 02.03.2022 | SE | 02.03.2022 | SI | 02.03.2022 | SK | 02.03.2022 | SM | 02.03.2022 | TR | 02.03.2022 | BG | 02.06.2022 | NO | 02.06.2022 | GR | 03.06.2022 | IS | 02.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 15.06.2015 | |
AL | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
MK | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
MK | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | CZ | 02.03.2022 | |
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 02.03.2022 | |
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 02.03.2022 | |
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 02.03.2022 | |
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 02.03.2022 | |
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.03.2022 | |
NO | 02.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6440725 (POURAHMADI FARZAD [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 2-3 *; | [A]US6852284 (HOLL MARK R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 13 *; | [A]US2007166196 (BARDELL RON L [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * [0049]-[0050], [0154];; figure 15 *; | [A]US2007263046 (IWASA KOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 46 *; | [A]US2010126857 (POLWART STUART [GB], et al) [A] 1-11* [0178], [0187]-[0188];; figures 16-18 *; | [X]US2013258318 (AYLIFFE HAROLD E [US]) [X] 1-11 * [0032],[0034]-[0035],[0038]-[0039],[0044]-[0045],[0050]-[0055],[0059]-[0060],[0065],[0067],[0072]-[0073];; figures 1-12 *; | [X]US2013327957 (AYLIFFE HAROLD E [US]) [X] 1-11 * [0031],[0032],[0042],[0055]-[0059],[0061]-[0064],[0070],[0073],[0075]-[0076],[0079],[0083];; figures 1, 2, 5-8, 10-12 *; | [A] - ORDEIG O ET AL, "Dual photonic electrochemical lab on a chip for lactate detection in continuous flow mode", 2011 16TH INTERNATIONAL SOLID-STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTEMS CONFERENCE (TRANSDUCERS 2011) ; BEIJING, CHINA; 5 - 9 JUNE 2011, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20110605), doi:10.1109/TRANSDUCERS.2011.5969230, ISBN 978-1-4577-0157-3, pages 2106 - 2109, XP031910572 [A] 1-11 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TRANSDUCERS.2011.5969230 | by applicant | US3910701 | US2007286774 | US7498177 | US2009317793 | US7791728 | US2011045492 | WO2012016107 | WO2013189502 | - THOMAS RUCKSTUHLDORINEL VERDES, Optics Express, (20040000), vol. 12, no. 18, pages 4246 - 4254 |