EP3633794 - CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRUONG, Bruno CEA GRENOBLE 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 02 /
DESPESSE, Ghislain CEA GRENOBLE 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/18] |
Former [2020/15] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19199105.8 | 24.09.2019 | [2020/15] | Priority number, date | FR20180059131 | 02.10.2018 Original published format: FR 1859131 | [2020/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3633794 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3633794 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/44, H01R11/01, H01R4/48, H01R11/07, // H01R4/62, H01R4/2404 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
H01R11/07 (EP,US);
H01R11/01 (EP,US);
H01R4/2408 (US);
H01R4/44 (EP);
H01R4/48 (US);
H01R4/48185 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSS | [2020/15] | English: | CONNECTOR | [2020/15] | French: | CONNECTEUR | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 05.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0340075 (NILED SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,12 * abstract * [I] 4,5,8,14,15; | [A]EP0533563 (FILOTEX SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE19757862 (RAUHUT HORST [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE19856568 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XI]EP0977310 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [X] 1-3,7,11,12 * paragraphs [0008] - [0009]; figures 1-4 * [I] 4-6,8-10,14,15; | [XI]CN106058504 (LIU FAN) [X] 1-3,13 * abstract * [I] 4,14,15; | [XI]CN107086378 (GUODIAN UNITED POWER TECH CO) [X] 1-5,7,11 * abstract * [I] 14,15; | [XI]CN107863616 (ZHENJIANG KESHENG ELECTRONIC TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,12 * abstract * [I] 4,14,15; | [XI]CN207233964U (ECONOMIC TECHNOLOGY RES INST STATE GRID GANSU ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,11,12 * abstract * [I] 4,7,13-15; | [XI]CN108075243 (WANG CAIFENG) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * [I] 4,14,15 | Examination | FR2370369 | FR2694663 | CN201868832U | by applicant | EP0340075 | EP0977310 | CN201750032U | CN106058504 | CN107086378 | CN107863616 | CN207233964U | CN108075243 |