EP3799283 - CLAMP CIRCUIT IN A RECTIFIER WITH MORE THAN TWO OUTPUT POTENTIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hensler, Alexander Vacher Str. 157b 90766 Fürth / DE | 02 /
Oschmann, Philipp Toblerweg 51 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Schierling, Hubert Pommernstr. 18 G 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19199206.4 | 24.09.2019 | [2021/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3799283 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/34, H02M7/487, H02M1/44 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
H02M7/487 (EP);
H02M1/34 (EP,CN,US);
H02M7/219 (CN,US);
H02M1/123 (US);
H02M1/44 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CLAMPINGSCHALTUNG BEI EINEM GLEICHRICHTER MIT MEHR ALS ZWEI AUSGANGSSEITIG BEREITGESTELLTEN POTENZIALEN | [2021/13] | English: | CLAMP CIRCUIT IN A RECTIFIER WITH MORE THAN TWO OUTPUT POTENTIALS | [2021/13] | French: | CIRCUIT LIMITEUR D'UN REDRESSEUR DOTÉ D'AU MOINS DEUX POTENTIELS OBTENUS COTÉ SORTIE | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/10] | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE102010008426 (HOCHSCHULE KONSTANZ [DE]) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0031] - [0038]; figures 1-3, 4a-4d,8 *; | [A]DE102012005622 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 2,3* figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102013112538 (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [A] 2,3 * figure 2a *; | [I] - Christoph Hammerschmidt, "Soft switching: Better efficiency for high power inverters", (20160411), HOCHSCHULE KONSTANZ [DE], URL: https://www.eenewspower.com/news/soft-switching-better-efficiency-high-power-inverters, (20200326), XP002798481 [I] 1-3 * "Now the university of Konstanz (Germany) has shown that also circuit topology bears potential for improvements with regards to efficiency as well as to EMI behaviour." "In this case however, not reducing the losses is the dominating factor but instead limiting the slope steepness (du/dt) and voltage surges" "Another interesting aspect is the capability of the circuit to limit the slew rate (du/dt)." * |