EP3798742 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTING CASE BODY AND LUGS FOR A WATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLICHTIG, Dohan Ziegelfeldstrasse 36 4600 Olten / CH | 02 /
GROSJEAN, Jérôme Sonville 6 2534 Orvin / CH | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19199353.4 | 24.09.2019 | [2021/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798742 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/14, G04B37/22 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G04B37/1486 (EP,CN);
A44C5/147 (US);
G04B37/0008 (CN,US);
G04B37/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZWISCHEN GEHÄUSERAHMEN UND SCHENKEL EINER ARMBANDUHR | [2021/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONNECTING CASE BODY AND LUGS FOR A WATCH | [2021/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION CARRURE-CORNE POUR UNE MONTRE | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 30.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB933969 (THEODOR ENGELHARD, et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,12,13 * page 2, lines 78-105; figures 1-3 * [A] 4,5,7,9-11; | [A]CH418985 (BULOVA WATCH CO INC [US]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A]WO9746922 (GRADOS CHRISTIAN [FR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]WO2009030984 (LOISEAU DOMINIQUE [CH]) [A] 1-13 * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR3021128 (OUALLI KEVIN [FR]) [A] 1-13 * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 31; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | EP0197416 | EP0466655 | CH708815 |