EP3623058 - OPTICAL EFFECT LAYERS SHOWING A VIEWING ANGLE DEPENDENT OPTICAL EFFECT; PROCESSES AND DEVICES FOR THEIR PRODUCTION; ITEMS CARRYING AN OPTICAL EFFECT LAYER; AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING SA Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Mathieu Rue due l'Académie 3 1005 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
Loginov, Evgeny Avenue de Florissant 2 1020 Renens / CH | 03 /
Despland, Claude-Alain Chemin de la Cure 8 1008 Prilly / CH | 04 /
Degott, Pierre Route du Grenet 2 1073 Mollie-Margot / CH | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/12] | 01 /
Schmid, Mathieu Rue du Vallon 10 1005 Lausanne / CH | ||
02 /
Loginov, Evgeny Avenue de Florissant 2 1020 Renens / CH | |||
03 /
Despland, Claude-Alain Chemin de la Cure 8 1008 Prilly / CH | |||
04 /
Degott, Pierre Route du Grenet 2 1073 Mollie-Margot / CH | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 19199514.1 | 20.12.2013 | [2020/12] | Priority number, date | EP20130150693 | 09.01.2013 Original published format: EP 13150693 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623058 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3623058 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05D3/00, B41M3/14, B42D25/29, H01F7/02, H01F41/16 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
B05D3/20 (EP,RU,US);
B42D25/30 (US);
B05D3/207 (EP,RU,US);
B05D5/06 (RU);
B41M3/148 (EP,RU,US);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
B42D25/369 (US);
G03G15/08 (RU);
H01F41/16 (EP,US);
H01F7/0273 (EP,US);
H01F7/0278 (US);
B42D2033/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] |
Former [2020/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHICHTEN MIT OPTISCHEM EFFEKT MIT EINEM SICHTWINKELABHÄNGIGEN OPTISCHEN EFFEKT, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, ARTIKEL MIT EINER SCHICHT MIT OPTISCHEM EFFEKT UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2020/12] | English: | OPTICAL EFFECT LAYERS SHOWING A VIEWING ANGLE DEPENDENT OPTICAL EFFECT; PROCESSES AND DEVICES FOR THEIR PRODUCTION; ITEMS CARRYING AN OPTICAL EFFECT LAYER; AND USES THEREOF | [2020/12] | French: | COUCHES À EFFET OPTIQUE PRÉSENTANT UN EFFET OPTIQUE DÉPENDANT DE L'ANGLE DE VISUALISATION, PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS POUR LEUR PRODUCTION, ARTICLES PORTANT UNE COUCHE À EFFET OPTIQUE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 14.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13811972.2 / EP2943290 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   09.04.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2022 | CY | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | MK | 17.08.2022 | SE | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | NO | 17.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | GB | 20.12.2022 | LU | 20.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
GB | 20.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
GB | 20.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
GB | 20.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
GB | 20.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | EE | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0556449 (HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO [JP]); | [A]US2006035080 (ARGOITIA ALBERTO [US]); | [XA]US2007172261 (RAKSHA VLADIMIR P [US], et al) | by applicant | US2570856 | US3676273 | US3791864 | US4838648 | US5364689 | EP0686675 | US5630877 | US6410130 | WO02073250 | WO02090002 | WO03000801 | US6531221 | US6582781 | US6838166 | WO2005002866 | WO2006006392 | WO2006063926 | EP1710756 | WO2007131833 | WO2010058026 | WO2011092502 |