EP3650505 - NON-CHROMATED CORROSION-RESISTANT COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLSOM, Michael E. 4 Geraldine Drive Ellingtom, CT Connecticut 06029 / US | 02 /
KAPALCZYNSKI, Krystyna 139 Selden Hill Drive West Hartford, CT Connecticut 06107 / US | 03 /
EMERSON, Sean C. 13 Omelia Road Broad Brook, CT Connecticut 06016 / US | 04 /
KRYZMAN, Michael A. 34 Hammick Road West Hartford, CT Connecticut 06107 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Weilong 884 Neipsic Road Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US | 06 /
PINKERMAN, Thomas F. 126 Country View Drive South Windsor, CT Connecticut 06074 / US | 07 /
ZAFIRIS, Georgios S. 170 Long Hill Drive Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 19199544.8 | 25.09.2019 | [2020/20] | Priority number, date | US201816185407 | 09.11.2018 Original published format: US201816185407 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650505 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/08, C09D7/60, C09D163/04 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
C09D5/082 (EP);
C09D161/06 (CN);
C09D5/086 (CN,US);
C09D163/04 (EP);
C09D171/00 (US);
C09D5/084 (CN,US);
C09D7/60 (EP);
F28F19/02 (US);
C08K3/24 (US);
C08K5/098 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D161/06, C08K5/098, C08K3/24 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] |
Former [2020/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHT CHROMATIERTE KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGE BESCHICHTUNG | [2020/20] | English: | NON-CHROMATED CORROSION-RESISTANT COATING | [2020/20] | French: | REVÊTEMENT NON CHROMÉ RÉSISTANT À LA CORROSION | [2020/20] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 12.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6211262 (MEJIRITSKI ALEXANDRE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,11 * the whole document * * column 1, line 17 - line 21 * * column 10, line 7 - line 33; example 2; table 5 *; | [A]CN101481510 (ZHONG DING [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011274835 (LIU WEI [US], et al) [A] 14* the whole document *; | [XI]US9522974 (BARRIAU EMILIE [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * * claims 7, 8, 10; table 1 * * column 26, line 1 - line 6 * * column 24, line 58 - line 59 * [I] 14,15 | by applicant | US10023963 |