EP3627723 - IMPROVED PROSE RELAY UE ACTIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASU MALLICK, Prateek c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
LOEHR, Joachim c/o Panasonic R&D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
HORI, Takako c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi, 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 19199663.6 | 24.07.2015 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3627723 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/155, H04W88/04 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H04B7/15557 (EP,CN,US);
H04W40/22 (CN);
H04W40/10 (CN);
H04W52/0229 (EP,CN,US);
H04W8/005 (CN,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,CN,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE UE-AKTIVIERUNG EINES PROSE-RELAIS | [2020/13] | English: | IMPROVED PROSE RELAY UE ACTIVATION | [2020/13] | French: | ACTIVATION UE DE RELAIS DE PROSE AMÉLIORÉE | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 15.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15002195.4 / EP3121974 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015026111 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | US2016204847 [ ] (RYU JINSOOK [KR], et al) [ ] * abstract ** paragraphs [0005] - [0006] - [ 173] , [ 176] , [ 180] - [0181] - [ 185] , [ 188] , [0204] - [0205] *; | [XI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Signalling considerations for UE-to-Network relay initiation", vol. RAN WG2, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20150525 - 20150529, (20150516), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-152165, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_90/Docs/, (20150516), XP050972649 [X] 1,3-5,8,9,11-13 * paragraph [0003]; figures 2-3 * [I] 2,6,7,10,14,15 | [X] - ZTE, "Discussions on Relay UE selection and discovery", vol. RAN WG1, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20150525 - 20150529, (20150524), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-152966 RELAY UE SELECTION AND DISCOVERY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20150524), XP050972166 [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0003] * | by applicant | - 3GPP TR 36.843 |