EP3628541 - KALEIDOSCOPIC PART FOR A VEHICLE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium 19 Boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium 19 boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBOST, Elise Plastic Omnium - Sigmatech A l'attention du manager Propriété Intellectuelle Avenue du Bois des Vergnes 01150 Sainte-Julie / FR | 02 /
STABLO, Frédéric Le Martaret, Rue des Ecoles 38390 Porcieu Amblagnieu / FR | 03 /
GUILLIER, Stéphane 46, rue de Monetroi 01800 Charnoz sur Ain / FR | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19199854.1 | 26.09.2019 | [2020/14] | Priority number, date | FR20180058830 | 26.09.2018 Original published format: FR 1858830 | [2020/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628541 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/00, B29C45/00, B60Q1/00, F21V8/00 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
B60R13/005 (EP);
B29C45/16 (EP);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K2360/33 (EP);
G02B6/0035 (EP);
G02B6/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALEIDOSKOP-KAROSSERIETEIL | [2020/14] | English: | KALEIDOSCOPIC PART FOR A VEHICLE BODY | [2020/14] | French: | PIÈCE DE CARROSSERIE KALÉIDOSCOPE | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9823432 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2002142111 (AULD DANIEL L [US], et al) [X] 1,4,11* figure 3 *; | [XY]EP1911630 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE SAFETY SYS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 4, line 19 * * paragraph [0016] * * figure 15 * [Y] 7; | [XI]EP2793062 (FAURECIA BLOC AVANT [FR]) [X] 1,3,7,8,11-13 * paragraph [0022] * * figures 3,5-6 * [I] 4-6,14; | [Y]WO2017125450 (GERHARDI KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7 * page 3, line 14 - line 16 * * figure 4 * |