EP3798798 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ENERGY AND/OR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT OF A HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies AG Spitalstrasse 5 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2024/39] |
Former [2024/18] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies AG Pestalozzistrasse 2 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2023/13] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited The Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2021/13] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELSCH, Tim Pfarrer-Wengler-Weg 1 31535 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
HOLLEMANN, Roland Otto-Löwe-Str. 11 38723 Seesen / DE | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19199890.5 | 26.09.2019 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798798 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F1/32, G06F1/3218, G06F1/3234, G06F1/3231 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/013 (EP,CN);
G06F3/011 (CN);
G09G5/373 (US);
G06F1/28 (US);
G06F1/3218 (EP);
G06F1/3231 (EP,US);
G06F1/3265 (EP);
G06F3/012 (CN);
G06F3/165 (US);
G09G2320/0626 (US);
G09G2330/023 (US);
G09G2340/0407 (US);
G09G2354/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR ENERGIE-UND/ODER RESSOURCENVERWALTUNG EINER MENSCH-MASCHINE-SCHNITTSTELLE | [2021/13] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ENERGY AND/OR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT OF A HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE | [2021/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE ET/OU DE RESSOURCES D'UNE INTERFACE HOMME-MACHINE | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 30.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2015058647 (NORO MASAAKI [JP]); | [XYI]US2015102996 (YIM DALE [KR], et al); | [YA]US2016180801 (LEE HOYOUNG [KR], et al); | [YA]WO2018115958 (ORANGE [FR]) |