EP3798934 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SCALABLE AND DECENTRALIZED INCREMENTAL MACHINE LEARNING WHICH PROTECTS DATA PRIVACY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers AG Siemensstraße 3 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/13] | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vodencarevic, Asmir Herrnstr. 33 90763 Fürth / DE | 02 /
Christ, Tilo Zeppelinstr. 22 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 19200147.7 | 27.09.2019 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798934 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06N20/20, G06N3/04, G06N3/12, G06N5/00, G06N5/02, G06N7/00 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G06N20/20 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (CN,US);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/217 (US);
G06F8/71 (US);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06N3/126 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR SKALIERBARES UND DEZENTRALES INKREMENTELLES MASCHINELLES LERNEN ZUM SCHUTZ DER DATENSICHERHEIT | [2021/13] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SCALABLE AND DECENTRALIZED INCREMENTAL MACHINE LEARNING WHICH PROTECTS DATA PRIVACY | [2021/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE INCRÉMENTAL ÉVOLUTIF ET DÉCENTRALISÉ QUI PROTÈGE LA CONFIDENTIALITÉ DES DONNÉES | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 27.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2018218155 (GOOGLE LLC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,12-15 * figures 1-15 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0 26] - [0342] * [I] 2,6,10,11; | [A]US2018373988 (DHANYAMRAJU S U M PRASAD [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0 15] - [0060] *; | [A] - LEONARDO TEIXEIRA ET AL, "Are Graph Neural Networks Miscalibrated?", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20190507), XP081273033 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, column lhc, paragraph 3 - page 4, column rhc, paragraph last * * page 9, column lhc, paragraph 1 - page 13, column lhc, paragraph last * | [A] - JOUAN A ET AL, "Incremental Machine Learning with Holographic Neural Theory for ATD/ATR", 2006 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION FUSION, FUSION - 2006 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION FUSION, FUSION 2006 INST. OF ELEC. AND ELEC. ENG. COMPUTER SOCIETY US, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060705), doi:10.1109/ICIF.2006.301696, ISBN 978-1-4244-0953-2, pages 1 - 8, XP031042437 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, column lhc, paragraph first - page 8, column lhc, paragraph last * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIF.2006.301696 |