EP3608385 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR CREATING HIGH CONDUCTIVITY FRACTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAINI, Rajesh K Clearwater International, LLC 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX Texas 77056 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Clayton S Clearwater International, LLC 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX Texas 77056 / US | 03 /
SAMUEL, Mathew M Clearwater International, LLC 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX Texas 77056 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Kern L Clearwater International, LLC 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX Texas 77056 / US | 05 /
HWANG, Chih-Chau Clearwater International, LLC 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX Texas 77056 / US | 06 /
VIGDERMAN, Leonid Clearwater International, LLC 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX Texas 77056 / US | 07 /
TREYBIG, Duane Clearwater International, LLC 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX Texas 77056 / US | 08 /
SINGH, Pratyush Clearwater International, LLC 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX Texas 77056 / US | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | Bradley, Josephine Mary Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 19200280.6 | 18.11.2014 | [2020/07] | Priority number, date | US201361905340P | 18.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361905340 P | US201414308160 | 18.06.2014 Original published format: US201414308160 | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608385 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/62, C09K8/80 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
C09K8/805 (EP,CN,MX,RU);
C09K8/03 (RU);
C09K8/62 (EP,CN,MX);
C09K8/56 (EP,CN,MX);
C09K8/86 (RU);
C09K8/92 (RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] |
Former [2020/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON FRAKTUREN MIT HOHER LEITFÄHIGKEIT | [2020/07] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR CREATING HIGH CONDUCTIVITY FRACTURES | [2020/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LA CRÉATION DE FRACTURES À HAUTE CONDUCTIVITÉ | [2020/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 12.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14824524.4 / EP3071665 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6776235 (ENGLAND KEVIN [US]); | [X]US2004206497 (GONZALEZ MANUEL E [US], et al); | [XD]US2010292108 (KAKADJIAN SARKIS R [US], et al); | [X]US2012305247 (CHEN YIYAN [US], et al); | [XD]US2013075100 (VELDMAN RAYNARD [US], et al) | by applicant | US2720540 | US3009954 | US3059909 | US3163219 | US3301848 | US3301723 | US3888312 | US4506734 | US4514309 | US4561985 | US4654266 | US4683068 | US4741401 | US5067566 | US5082579 | US5106518 | US5110486 | US5465792 | US5624886 | US5649596 | US5669447 | US5807812 | US5806597 | US5877127 | US6162449 | US6162766 | US6228812 | US7392847 | US7451812 | US2010212905 | US7956017 | US2013075100 | US8466094 | US8871694 |