EP3705068 - ROTATING ROD REDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer Biomet Spine, Inc. 10225 Westmoor Drive Westminster, Colorado 80021 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAST, Randall G. 3233 West 31st Avenue Denver, CO 80211 / US | 02 /
CAPOTE, Allison Christine 1414 Mountain Pines Road Boulder, CO 80302 / US | 03 /
STOLL, Caleb Lee 13848 Teal Creek Drive Broomfield, CO 80023 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Platzöder, Michael Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/02] | Venner Shipley LLP, et al 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2020/37] | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19200898.5 | 01.10.2019 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | US201862739544P | 01.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862739544 P | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705068 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3705068 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
A61B17/7086 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0042 (US);
A61B2017/564 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] |
Former [2020/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROTIERENDER STABREDUZIERER | [2020/37] | English: | ROTATING ROD REDUCER | [2020/37] | French: | RÉDUCTEUR DE TIGE ROTATIF | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 17.04.2020 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 09.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 09.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6440133 (BEALE JEFFREY W [US], et al); | [AD]US7909835 (ORIBE KAZUYA [JP], et al); | [AD]US8747409 (ICHELMANN BRUNO [FR], et al); | [A]US2018132911 (WU CHUNHUI [CN], et al) | by applicant | US7909835 | US8192438 | USRE44296E | US8679128 | US8747409 |