EP3708415 - BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2020/38] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2, Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Huixiu Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
DU, Baohai Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Wei Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
LI, Qiandeng Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Neumarkterstr. 21 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19201016.3 | 02.10.2019 | [2020/38] | Priority number, date | CN201910136059 | 25.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910136059 | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3708415 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3708415 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60L58/10 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
B60L58/10 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (EP);
B60L3/0069 (EP);
B60L3/0084 (EP);
B60L3/0092 (EP);
B60L3/04 (EP);
H01M10/4207 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/441 (US);
H01M50/249 (EP);
H02J7/00036 (EP);
H02J7/0047 (EP,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/38] | English: | BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2020/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIE | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 15.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2014212714 (BUTZMANN STEFAN [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 3, 4 * [Y] 2,3; | [XY]CN105730274 (ANHUI JIANGHUAI AUTOMOBILE CO) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]CN206541901U (HUIZHOU SHENGXINYUAN TECH CO LTD) [Y] 2,3* paragraph [0013] * |