EP3632725 - AIR DIFFUSER FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seat, S.A. Autovia A-2, Km. 585 08760 Martorell / ES | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEÑA MARTÍNEZ, José SEAT, S.A. Autovía A-2 Km 585 08760 Martorell / ES | 02 /
DEL CAMPO MELGAREJO, Luis SEAT, S.A. Autovía A-2 Km 585 08760 Martorell / ES | 03 /
PÉREZ DÍAZ, Manuel SEAT, S.A. Autovía A-2 Km 585 08760 Martorell / ES | 04 /
PÉREZ SERRANO, Rubén SEAT, S.A. Autovía A-2 Km 585 08760 Martorell / ES | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 19201190.6 | 02.10.2019 | [2020/15] | Priority number, date | ES20180030960 | 05.10.2018 Original published format: ES 201830960 | [2020/15] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632725 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/34, F24F13/14 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
B60H1/3414 (EP,ES);
F24F13/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] |
Former [2020/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTVERTEILER FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2020/15] | English: | AIR DIFFUSER FOR A VEHICLE | [2020/15] | French: | DIFFUSEUR D'AIR POUR VÉHICULE | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 06.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2017013783 (DAIKYONISHIKAWA CORP) [X] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0078]; figures 1-22 * [I] 9,12; | [XI]US2016152116 (ALBIN DOUGLAS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0045]; figures 1-2,11 * [I] 3-5,9,11; | [XI]US2008014855 (LESERRE DOMINIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,2,7,9-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0049]; figures 1-3 * [I] 3-6,8 | by applicant | EP1331116 |