EP3789513 - COATING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR METALLIC COATING OF WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sturm Maschinen- & Anlagenbau GmbH Industriestraße 10 94330 Salching / DE | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Carlos Altstraße 42 94469 Deggendorf / DE | 02 /
BAIER, Roland Am Rosenberg 40 93077 Bad Abbach / DE | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte PartG mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/25] | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2021/10] | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19201679.8 | 07.10.2019 | [2021/10] | Priority number, date | EP20190196156 | 09.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19196156 | EP20190200051 | 27.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19200051 | EP20190200059 | 27.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19200059 | [2021/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3789513 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3789513 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, C23C4/123, C23C4/134, C23C24/10, B05B7/22, B05B13/02, B05B14/30, B23K26/08, B23K26/16, B23K26/342, B05B13/04, B05B16/20, B22F3/00, B22F3/115, B22F7/02, B22F7/08, B22F10/28, B22F12/00, B22F12/55, B23K26/144 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
C23C24/10 (EP,US);
C23C4/00 (KR);
C23C4/12 (EP,CN);
B05B13/0228 (EP);
B05B13/0442 (EP);
B05B14/30 (EP);
B05B16/20 (EP);
B22F10/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/224 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/38 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/55 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F3/003 (EP);
B22F3/1007 (US);
B22F3/115 (EP);
B23K26/0006 (US);
B23K26/0093 (EP,US);
B23K26/0823 (EP);
B23K26/144 (EP,US);
B23K26/1464 (EP);
B23K26/16 (EP);
B23K26/34 (EP);
B23K26/342 (EP,US);
C23C24/103 (CN);
C23C24/106 (EP);
C23C26/02 (KR);
C23C4/01 (KR);
C23C4/06 (CN);
C23C4/123 (EP,US);
C23C4/134 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C23C4/18 (KR,US);
F16D65/127 (EP);
B05B13/0415 (EP);
B05B14/10 (EP);
B05B15/70 (EP);
B05B16/80 (EP);
B05B16/95 (EP);
B05B7/228 (EP);
B22F10/00 (EP,US);
B22F12/53 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/70 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/86 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F2201/50 (US);
B22F2202/11 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
B22F7/02 (EP);
B22F7/08 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F3/003, B22F2202/11, B22F3/115 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/003, B22F3/115, B22F7/02 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/10] | C23C4/12, C23C4/123, C23C4/134, C23C24/10, B22F3/105, B22F7/08, B23K26/14, B23K26/16, B23K26/342, B05B7/22, B05B13/02, B05B14/30, B05C9/04, F16D65/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM METALLISCHEN BESCHICHTEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN | [2021/10] | English: | COATING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR METALLIC COATING OF WORKPIECES | [2021/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REVÊTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT MÉTALLIQUE DE PIÈCES | [2021/10] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 28.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 21.06.2023 | MC | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/10] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 21.09.2023 | |
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH0683177U (ISEHARA-SHI, KANAGAWA PREFECTURE) [X] 1,2,10-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0020] * * claim 1 * * figures 1-2 * [Y] 4-6 [I] 3,7-9; | [Y]EP0661127 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4-6 * column 9 - column 11 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2006272909 (FULLER BRIAN K [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0041] *; | [A]US2014186549 (MIYAGI MASANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * * claims 1-15 ** figures 4-5 *; | [Y]CN104388929 (JIANGSU ZKSX LASER TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]CN107904591 (ADVANCED MANUFACTURE TECH CENTER CHINA ACADEMY OF MACHINERY SCIENCE & TECH) [Y] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2018069266 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 1-2 * * claim 1 * |