EP3636977 - ATTENUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grace Precision Products, LLC P.O. Box 706 Webb City, MO 64870 / US | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mann, Michael David 7018 Belle Center Joplin, MO Missouri 64801 / US | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 19201856.2 | 08.10.2019 | [2020/16] | Priority number, date | US201816155402 | 09.10.2018 Original published format: US201816155402 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636977 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/04 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
F16L55/043 (EP,US);
F04C15/0049 (US);
F15D1/025 (US);
F16L55/027 (US);
F16L55/053 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFER | [2020/16] | English: | ATTENUATOR | [2020/16] | French: | ATTÉNUATEUR | [2020/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/12] | 05.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6712096 (TISCHLER DIETER [US]) [AD] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5609477 (SAURWEIN ALBERT C [US]) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102011014938 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US6712096 | US9163617 |