EP3805965 - METHOD FOR VALIDATING TRUSTED DATA IN A COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Camelot ITLAB GmbH Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göbel, Andreas Fasanenweg 3 76694 Forst / DE | 02 /
Joswig, Steffen Kirchstraße 56 69514 Laudenbach / DE | 03 /
Packowski, Josef Bergstraße 101 69121 Heidelberg / DE | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | 2s-ip Schramm Schneider Bertagnoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Part mbB Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19201986.7 | 08.10.2019 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805965 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3805965 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/50, G06F21/57 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G06F21/57 (EP,US);
G06F21/50 (EP);
G06F2221/032 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VALIDIEREN VON VERTRAUENSWÜRDIGEN DATEN IN EINEM COMPUTERSYSTEM | [2021/15] | English: | METHOD FOR VALIDATING TRUSTED DATA IN A COMPUTER SYSTEM | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE VALIDATION DE DONNÉES DE CONFIANCE DANS UN SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 14.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 14.06.2023 | |
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE60012041T (ORACLE CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2010251242 (SIVASUBRAMANIAN SWAMINATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-14* figures 1, 2, 4 *; | [YA]US2019012666 (KRAUSS SIMON [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,14 * paragraphs [0046] - [0078]; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,6-13; | [YA]WO2019185710 (NEC LABORATORIES EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,14 * pages 4-6; figures 3-5 * [A] 4,6-13 |