EP3643676 - SYSTEM, DISPOSABLE CARTRIDGE, AND METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF A LIQUID PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apiqe Holdings, LLC 1605, Lockness Place TORRANCE CA 90501 / US | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERBEEK, Roland Waldemar 38, Valkeveenselaan 1272 ND Huizen / NL | 02 /
VAN DE SLUIS, Jasper Jacobus 92, Lamerislaan 3571 LE Utrecht / NL | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 19202032.9 | 17.11.2015 | [2020/18] | Priority number, date | NL20142013824 | 17.11.2014 Original published format: NL 2013824 | NL20142013947 | 09.12.2014 Original published format: NL 2013947 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3643676 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3643676 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/00, A23L2/52, A23L2/54, A47J31/36, A47J31/40, B65D85/804 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B67D1/0078 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A47J31/3695 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A47J31/3628 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A23L2/54 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A47J31/407 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
B65D85/804 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B65D85/8043 (IL,KR,US);
B65D85/8049 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B65D85/8052 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B65D85/8055 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B65D85/8064 (EP,CN,IL,US);
B67D1/0004 (IL,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/18] | B67D1/00, A23L2/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] |
Former [2020/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM, EINWEGPATRONE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLÜSSIG PRODUKTS | [2020/18] | English: | SYSTEM, DISPOSABLE CARTRIDGE, AND METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF A LIQUID PRODUCT | [2020/18] | French: | SYSTÈME, CARTOUCHE JETABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN PRODUIT LIQUIDE | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 05.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15832768.4 / EP3221251 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2007114685 (MECCANO ASIA LTD, et al) [AD] 1-12,15* page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 25; figures 1-11 *; | [YDA]WO2011138405 (BRITA GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 5 * page 22, line 18 - line 23; figure 12 * [A] 9; | [XY]WO2012125032 (CUPSYSTEM COMPANY B V [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,11,15 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 6, line 1 - line 12 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 1 * * page 9, line 5 - line 10 * * page 9, line 33 - line 37 * * page 13, line 5 - line 7 * * page 13, line 28 - line 31 * * page 14, line 28 - page 15, line 3 * * page 16, line 11 - line 24 * * page 18, line 34 - line 37 * * page 22, line 33 - page 23, line 2 * * page 24, line 14 - line 22 * * page 27, line 36 - page 28, line 8 * * figures 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8a, 8b * * page 21, line 31 - page 22, line 5 * * page 6, line 19 - line 25 * [Y] 5 | by applicant | US4808346 | WO2005077811 | WO2007114685 | WO2011138405 | US2014331868 | US2015125586 |