EP3726858 - LOWER LAYER REPRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTHER, Andreas c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
GREWE, Yannik c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
KLAPP, Julian c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Integrierte Schaltungen IIS Am Wolfsmantel 33 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Pfitzner, Hannes, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 19202209.3 | 09.10.2019 | [2020/43] | Priority number, date | EP20190169676 | 16.04.2019 Original published format: EP 19169676 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726858 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04S3/00, // H04R3/12 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
H04S3/008 (EP,US);
H04S7/302 (US);
H04R3/04 (US);
H04R3/12 (EP);
H04R5/02 (US);
H04R5/04 (US);
H04S7/301 (US);
H04R2205/022 (EP);
H04R2205/024 (EP);
H04S2400/01 (US);
H04S2400/07 (EP,US);
H04S2400/11 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REPRODUKTION EINER UNTEREN SCHICHT | [2020/43] | English: | LOWER LAYER REPRODUCTION | [2020/43] | French: | REPRODUCTION DE COUCHE INFÉRIEURE | [2020/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1562401 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0031] - [0036]; figure 3A *[A] 1-10,12-21; | [XAYI]WO2013006330 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12,13,17-21 * paragraphs [0064] - [0072]; figures 1-3 * [A] 5,14,16 [Y] 11 [I] 15; | [XAYI]US2015023505 (MORROW CHARLES [US]) [X] 1-10,12,14,16-21 * paragraphs [0010] - [0056]; figure 2 * [A] 13 [Y] 11 [I] 15; | [XAYI]EP3163915 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4,8,9,14,20,21 * paragraphs [0087] - [0098] - [0253]; figure 3 * [A] 5-7,10,12,13,16-19 [Y] 11 [I] 15; | [XAI] - Marantz, "NR1608 AV Receiver", Internet, Internet, (20170601), URL: https://www.us.marantz.com/shop/avreceivers/nr1608?status=discontinue, (20200616), XP055705610 [X] 1-4,6,7,10,13,17-21 * section "key features" * [A] 5,11,12,14,16 [I] 8,9,15 | by applicant | WO2017021162 |