EP3805243 - ANDROSTANE DERIVATIVES WITH ACTIVITY AS PURE OR PREDOMINANTLY PURE STIMULATORS OF SERCA2A FOR THE TREATMENT OF HEART FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windtree Therapeutics, Inc. 2600 Kelly Road, Suite 100 Warrington, PA 18976-3622 / US | [2021/29] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Windtree Therapeutics, Inc. 2600 Kelly Road, Suite 100 Warrington, PA 18976-3622 / US | ||
For all designated states Università degli Studi di Milano - Bicocca Piazza dell'Ateneo Nuovo, 1 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERRI, Alberto "" deceased / IT | 02 /
FERRARI, Patrizia Via Gasparotto 57 21100 Varese / IT | 03 /
FERRANDI, Mara Via Cenisio 34 20100 Milano / IT | 04 /
BARASSI, Paolo Via Campagnetta 6B 21010 Castelvaccana (VA) / IT | 05 /
BIANCHI, Giuseppe Piazza Adigrat 4 20133 Milano / IT | 06 /
HSU, Shin-Che 3F.,No,50,Aly.119,Ln.103,Sec.2 Neihu Rd Neihu Dist TAIWAN / CN | 07 /
PERI, Francesco Via Chopin 99 20141 Milano / IT | 08 /
ZAZA, Antonio Via Vincenzo Foppa 11 20144 Milano / IT | 09 /
ROCCHETTI, Marcella Vialle della Vittoria 30/A 20861 Brugherio (MB) / IT | 10 /
LURAGHI, Andrea Via M.D'Azeglio 1 20023 Cerro Maggiore / IT | 11 /
TORRE, Eleonora Via Segantini 25 20832 Desio (MB) / IT | 12 /
RONCHI, Carlotta Via Budua 6 20159 Milano / IT | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
CERRI, Alberto "" deceased / IT | ||
02 /
FERRARI, Patrizia Via Gasparotto 57 21100 Varese / IT | |||
03 /
FERRANDI, Mara Via Cenisio 34 20100 Milano / IT | |||
04 /
BARASSI, Paolo Via Campagnetta 6B 21010 Castelvaccana (VA) / IT | |||
05 /
BIANCHI, Giuseppe Piazza Adigrat 4 20133 Milano / IR | |||
06 /
HSU, Shin-Che 3F.,No,50,Aly.119,Ln.103,Sec.2 Neihu Rd Neihu Dist TAIWAN / CN | |||
07 /
PERI, Francesco Via Chopin 99 20141 Milano / IT | |||
08 /
ZAZA, Antonio Via Vincenzo Foppa 11 20144 Milano / IT | |||
09 /
ROCCHETTI, Marcella Vialle della Vittoria 30/A 20861 Brugherio (MB) / IT | |||
10 /
LURAGHI, Andrea Via M.D'Azeglio 1 20023 Cerro Maggiore / IT | |||
11 /
TORRE, Eleonora Via Segantini 25 20832 Desio (MB) / IT | |||
12 /
RONCHI, Carlotta Via Budua 6 20159 Milano / IT | Representative(s) | Cantaluppi, Stefano, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Via A. Canova, 2 20145 Milano / IT | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/15] | Ghirardi, Valeria, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Via Strobel, 8 20133 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 19202257.2 | 09.10.2019 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805243 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3805243 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07J1/00, C07J41/00, C07J43/00, A61K31/566, A61K31/58, A61P9/04, // C07J21/00, C07J51/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
C07J1/0011 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/56 (KR);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P9/04 (CN,KR);
C07J1/0022 (EP,IL);
C07J21/008 (EP,IL);
C07J41/0038 (EP,IL,KR);
C07J41/0088 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07J43/003 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07J51/00 (EP,IL)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANDROSTANDERIVATE MIT WIRKUNG ALS REINE ODER VORWIEGEND REINE STIMULATOREN VON SERCA2A ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HERZVERSAGEN | [2021/15] | English: | ANDROSTANE DERIVATIVES WITH ACTIVITY AS PURE OR PREDOMINANTLY PURE STIMULATORS OF SERCA2A FOR THE TREATMENT OF HEART FAILURE | [2021/15] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'ANDROSTANE AYANT UNE ACTIVITÉ DE STIMULATEURS PURS OU MAJORITAIREMENT PURS DE SERCA2A POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | EE | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3580905 (BROWN IVOR JAMES STEWART, et al); | [AD]EP0825197 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT]); | [XI]WO2007118830 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT], et al); | [A]WO2007118832 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT], et al); | by applicant | US4534899 | US5605674 | US5716928 | EP0825197 | US5846743 | US5858401 | US5874268 | US6007839 | US6063400 | US6261815 | US6358530 | US6509006 | US6589503 | US6592904 | US2004028670 | US2004151766 | US2005136121 | US2006083737 | US7097827 | US7109034 | US2007042031 | US2007077286 | US2007082042 | US2007110798 | US7306783 |