EP3639740 - MAPPING OF ACTIVATION WAVEFRONTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam, 2066717 / IL | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Assaf c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 02 /
BAR-TAL, Meir c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 03 /
NAKAR, Elad c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 04 /
ILAN, Ido c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/35] |
Former [2020/17] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19202997.3 | 14.10.2019 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | US201816160062 | 15.10.2018 Original published format: US201816160062 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639740 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3639740 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/287 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A61B5/287 (EP,US);
A61B5/02028 (BR,KR);
A61B5/7225 (IL);
A61B5/743 (KR);
A61B5/318 (CN);
A61B5/341 (BR,KR,US);
A61B18/1492 (BR);
A61B5/308 (KR);
A61B5/316 (BR);
A61B5/339 (CN,KR);
A61B5/349 (KR);
A61B5/7235 (IL);
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | A61B5/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ABBILDUNG VON AKTIVIERUNGSWELLENFRONTEN | [2020/17] | English: | MAPPING OF ACTIVATION WAVEFRONTS | [2020/17] | French: | CARTOGRAPHIE DE FRONTS D'ONDE D'ACTIVATION | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 03.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.11.2022 | 10.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23194028.9 / EP4299006 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014058282 (O'GRADY GREGORY B [NZ], et al); | Examination | US2014336520 | US2017055864 | US2017311833 | WO2017192769 | by applicant | US6226542 | US6301496 | US6814733 | US6892091 | US6997924 | US7156816 | US7536218 | US7756576 | US2015228254 | US2017055864 | US2017311833 |