EP3644150 - WORKPIECE HOLDING DEVICE AND LOADING APPARATUS THAT USES THE WORKPIECE HOLDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakamura-Tome Precision Industry Co., Ltd. Ro 15 Netsuno, Hakusan Ishikawa 920-2195 / JP | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAWADA, Manabu c/o Nakamura-Tome Precision Industry Co., Ltd. Ro 15 Netsuno Hakusan, Ishikawa 920-2195 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMURA, Naotsugu c/o Nakamura-Tome Precision Industry Co., Ltd. Ro 15 Netsuno Hakusan, Ishikawa 920-2195 / JP | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte PartG mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19203331.4 | 15.10.2019 | [2020/18] | Priority number, date | JP20180196259 | 18.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018196259 | JP20180196258 | 18.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018196258 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3644150 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/401, B23Q17/00 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
B23Q7/043 (EP);
B23Q17/20 (EP,US);
B23B31/16258 (US);
B23Q17/003 (US);
G05B19/401 (US);
B23B2231/10 (US);
B23B2231/26 (US);
B23B2260/128 (US);
G05B2219/37207 (US);
G05B2219/37236 (US);
Y10T279/1906 (US);
Y10T279/1973 (US);
Y10T279/21 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] |
Former [2020/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKSTÜCKHALTEVORRICHTUNG UND LADEVORRICHTUNG, DIE DIE WERKSTÜCKHALTEVORRICHTUNG VERWENDET | [2020/18] | English: | WORKPIECE HOLDING DEVICE AND LOADING APPARATUS THAT USES THE WORKPIECE HOLDING DEVICE | [2020/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN DE PIÈCE À USINER ET APPAREIL DE CHARGEMENT AU MOYEN DU DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE PIÈCES | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 20.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0556049 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * figure 2 ** page 20 *; | [XYI]EP3199297 (NAKAMURA-TOME PREC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] * [Y] 5 [I] 3,4; | [A] - Supervisor Upc ET AL, "REPORT "DESIGN OF A POSITION ENCODER USING INFRARED SENSORS" Master Thesis by Martín Castaño Sánchez", (20150531), URL: https://upcommons.upc.edu/bitstream/handle/2099.1/26227/Report_MCS.pdf, (20200226), XP055671915 [A] 3 * page 48 * | by applicant | JP2000343474 |