EP3809136 - TCR-INDEPENDENT MOLECULAR IDENTIFICATION OF MUTATION-RELATED AND TUMOR-SPECIFIC T CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medizinische Hochschule Hannover Carl-Neuberg-Strasse 1 30625 Hannover / DE | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woller, Norman Gerhart-Hauptmann-Str. 22 30629 Hannover / DE | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Moré, Solveig Helga, et al Kroher Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19203651.5 | 16.10.2019 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809136 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569, G01N33/574 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/56972 (EP);
G01N33/56966 (US);
G01N33/574 (EP);
G01N33/57492 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70517 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70553 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TCR-UNABHÄNGIGE MOLEKULARE IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON MUTATIONSBEZOGENEN UND TUMORSPEZIFISCHEN T-ZELLEN | [2021/16] | English: | TCR-INDEPENDENT MOLECULAR IDENTIFICATION OF MUTATION-RELATED AND TUMOR-SPECIFIC T CELLS | [2021/16] | French: | IDENTIFICATION MOLÉCULAIRE DE CELLULES T LIÉES À LA MUTATION ET SPÉCIFIQUES DE TUMEUR INDÉPENDANTE DU TCR | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013126809 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [A]WO2019014581 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * abstract * * claims 1,14,50 *; | [A]WO2019053244 (UNIV ZUERICH [CH]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [A] - SOLINAS CINZIA ET AL, "The immune infiltrate in prostate, bladder and testicular tumors: An old friend for new challenges", CANCER TREATMENT REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20161230), vol. 53, doi:10.1016/J.CTRV.2016.12.004, ISSN 0305-7372, pages 138 - 145, XP029903744 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * abstract * * tables 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ctrv.2016.12.004 | [A] - PATRICK A OTT ET AL, "An Update on Adoptive T-Cell Therapy and Neoantigen Vaccines", AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY EDUCATIONAL BOOK. AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY. MEETINGUNITED STATES2013, (20190517), vol. 39, doi:10.1200/EDBK_, ISSN 1548-8756, pages e70 - e78, XP055682464 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * abstract * * Box: Practical applications * * section "Targeting neoantigens with adoptive transfer of TILs" on pages e71-e72 * * section "Endogenous T-cell therapy" on page e74 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/EDBK_ | by applicant | - OSTROUMOV et al., Cell. Mol. Life Sci., (20180000), vol. 75, pages 689 - 713 | - DUNN et al., Annu Rev Immunol, (20040000), vol. 22, pages 329 - 360 | - DUDLEY et al., Science, (20020000), vol. 298, pages 850 - 854 | - KNOCKE et al., Cell Reports, (20160000), vol. 17, pages 2234 - 2246 | - RAY et al., J. Immunol., (20090000), vol. 183, pages 7672 - 82 | - CASTLE et al., Cancer Res, (20120000), vol. 72, pages 1081 - 1091 | - VAN ROOIJ et al., J Clin Oncol, (20130000), vol. 31, pages e439 - e442 | - GARCIA-GUERRERO et al., Front. Immunol., (20180000), vol. 9, pages 1971 - 1986 | - HUANG et al., Nature, (20170000), vol. 545, pages 60 - 65 | - LEBEL-BINAY et al., J Immunol., (19950000), vol. 155, pages 101 - 110 | - TSAI et al., FEBS Lett., (20110000), vol. 585, no. 20, pages 3166 - 3173 | - GUBIN et al., Nature, (20140000), vol. 515, no. 7528, pages 577 - 581 | - CHAMPIAT et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20160000), vol. 23, no. 8, pages 1920 - 8 | - KNOCKE et al., Cell Rep, (20160000), vol. 17, pages 2234 - 46 | - WOLLER et al., J Clin Invest., (20110000), vol. 121, no. 7, pages 2570 - 2582 | - KHALAF et al., Clinical Gastroenterology and Hepatology, (20170000), vol. 15, pages 273 - 2 | - CHEN et al., Oncology Letters, (20180000), vol. 15, pages 855 - 862 | - ROVARIS et al., Blood, (20060000), vol. 108, no. 9, pages 2897 - 905 |