EP3620172 - NON-CROSS-LINKED ACELLULAR PERTUSSIS ANTIGENS FOR USE IN COMBINATION VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARLI, Lorenzo c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics Srl Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
CONTORNI, Mario c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics Srl Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | 03 /
BARTALESI, Alessandro c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics Srl Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Evans, Stephen John Eves GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents CN925.1 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 19203794.3 | 11.10.2013 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | US201261713356P | 12.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261713356 P | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620172 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/102, A61K39/29 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
A61K39/0016 (EP,US);
A61K39/0018 (US);
A61K39/099 (EP,US);
A61K39/13 (US);
A61K39/292 (US);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (US);
C12N2730/10134 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNVERNETZTE AZELLULÄRE PERTUSSIS-ANTIGENE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN KOMBINATIONSIMPFSTOFFEN | [2020/11] | English: | NON-CROSS-LINKED ACELLULAR PERTUSSIS ANTIGENS FOR USE IN COMBINATION VACCINES | [2020/11] | French: | ANTIGÈNES DE PERTUSSIS ACELLULAIRES NON RÉTICULÉS POUR LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES VACCINS COMBINÉS | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 12.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13774463.7 / EP2906239 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9913906 (PASTEUR MERIEUX MSD [FR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, line 6 - line 11 * * page 11, line 1 - line 29 * * page 13 * * examples 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2008135514 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 16 * * page 17, line 7 - line 8 ** page 21, line 4 - line 9 *; | [XY] - PODDA A ET AL, "Phase I clinical trial of an acellular pertussis vaccine composed of genetically detoxified pertussis toxin combined with FHA and 69 kDa", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 9, no. 10, doi:10.1016/0264-410X(91)90290-M, ISSN 0264-410X, (19911001), pages 741 - 745, (19911001), XP023709315 [X] 1,2 * page 742, column left * * page 743, column right * [Y] 3,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(91)90290-M | [XY] - DI TOMMASO A ET AL, "Acellular pertussis vaccines containing genetically detoxified pertussis toxin induce long-lasting humoral and cellular responses in adults", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, (19970801), vol. 15, no. 11, doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(97)00023-6, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1218 - 1224, XP004086592 [X] 1,2 * page 1219, column left * [Y] 3,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(97)00023-6 | [Y] - LOOSMORE S M ET AL, "ENGINEERING OF GENETICALLY DETOXIFIED PERTUSSIS TOXIN ANALOGS FOR DEVELOPMENT OF A RECOMBINANT WHOOPING COUGH VACCINE", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MACROBIOLOGY, USA, (19901101), vol. 58, no. 11, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 3653 - 3662, XP002910752 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - GRECO D ET AL, "A CONTROLLED TRIAL OF TWO ACELLULAR VACCINES AND ONE WHOLE-CELL VACCINE AGAINST PERTUSSIS", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, THE, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, WALTHAM, MA, US, (19960208), vol. 334, no. 6, doi:10.1056/NEJM199602083340601, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 341 - 348, XP002058255 [Y] 1-4 * page 342, column left * * page 344 - page 345 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM199602083340601 | by applicant | US4057685 | US4356170 | US4459286 | US4624918 | EP0208375 | US4663160 | US4666886 | US4673574 | US4695624 | US4761283 | US4808700 | US4882317 | GB2220211 | EP0372501 | EP0378881 | US4965338 | WO9014837 | WO9101146 | EP0427347 | EP0471177 | EP0477508 | WO9317712 | WO9403206 | WO9403208 | US5306492 | EP0594610 | WO9421292 | WO9508348 | WO9511700 | EP0477508 | WO9640242 | WO9700697 | WO9842721 | WO9858668 | US6013264 | WO0010599 | WO0056360 | WO0061761 | WO0172337 | WO0200249 | WO02091998 | WO03011223 | WO03066094 | US6630161 | WO2004041157 | US2005215517 | WO2005097181 | US2007014805 | WO2007040840 | WO2007053455 | WO2007054820 | WO2007080308 | WO2008005555 | WO2008028956 | WO2008028957 | WO2008043774 | WO2008056263 | US7427404 | WO2009067081 | WO2009111337 | WO2009118296 | WO2010014913 | WO2010023551 | WO2010144734 | WO2011067669 | WO2011067672 | WO2011067673 | WO2011141819 | WO2011154442 | WO2011154443 | WO2011154444 | US8092813 | WO2012031140 | - BARALDO et al., Infect Immun, (20040000), vol. 72, pages 4884 - 87 | - RAPPUOLI et al., TIBTECH, (19910000), vol. 9, pages 232 - 238 | - LOOSMORE et al., Infect Immun, (19900000), vol. 58, no. 5, pages 3653 - 366 | - NENCIONI et al., Infect Immun, (19910000), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 625 - 30 | - BURNETTE et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 72 - 74 | - COCKLE, FEES Letters, (19890000), vol. 249, pages 329 - 332 | - EDWARDS et al., Pediatrics, (19950000), vol. 96, no. 3, pages 548 - 57 | - PICHICHERO et al., Pediatrics, (19970000), vol. 100, no. 5, pages 772 - 88 | - DI TOMMASO et al., Infect Immun, (19940000), vol. 62, no. 5, pages 1830 - 4 | - DENOEL et al., Vaccine, (20020000), vol. 20, pages 2551 - 5 | - LYNG, Biologicals, (19900000), vol. 18, pages 11 - 17 | - SESARDIC et al., Biologicals, (20010000), vol. 29, pages 107 - 22 | - KUHMLANNRIEGER, mmunol Infect Dis, (19950000), vol. 5, pages 10 - 4 | - SESARDIC et al., Biologicals, (20020000), vol. 30, pages 49 - 68 | - RAMSAY et al., Lancet, (20010000), vol. 357, no. 9251, pages 195 - 196 | - LINDBERG, Vaccine, (19990000), vol. 2, pages 28 - 36 | - BUTTERYMOXON, JR Coll Physicians Lond, (20000000), vol. 34, pages 163 - 168 | - AHMADCHAPNICK, Infect Dis Clin North Am, (19990000), vol. 13, pages 113 - 133 | - GOLDBLATT, J. Med. Microbiol., (19980000), vol. 47, pages 563 - 567 | - HERMANSON, Bioconjugate Techniques, (19960000), vol. 10, pages 48 - 114 | - LEES et al., Vaccine, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 190 - 198 | - Mol. Immunol., (19850000), vol. 22, pages 907 - 919 | - GEVER et al., Med. Microbiol. Immunol., (19790000), vol. 165, pages 171 - 288 | - ANDERSON, Infect Immun, (19830000), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 233 - 238 | - ANDERSON et al., J Clin Invest, (19850000), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 52 - 59 | - KANRA et al., The Turkish Journal of Paediatrics, (19990000), vol. 42, pages 421 - 427 | - RAVENSCROFT et al., Dev Biol (Basel, (20000000), vol. 103, pages 35 - 47 | - GIULIANI et al., PNAS USA, (20060000), vol. 103, pages 10834 - 9 | - W.H.O., Tech. Rep. Ser., (19760000), vol. 51, page 594 | - ZIELEN et al., Infect. Immun., (20000000), vol. 68, pages 1435 - 1440 | - DARKES, Paediatr Drugs, (20020000), vol. 4, pages 609 - 630 | - WATSON, Pediatr Infect Dis J, (20000000), vol. 19, pages 331 - 332 | - RUBIN, Pediatr Clin North Am, (20000000), vol. 47, pages 269 - 285 | - JEDRZEJAS, Microbiol Mol Biol Rev, (20010000), vol. 65, pages 187 - 207 | - VANLANDSCHOOT et al., J Gen Virol, (20050000), vol. 86, pages 323 - 31 | - LIAO et al., J Infect Dis., (20120000), vol. 205, pages 237 - 43 | - FALUGI et al., Eur J Immunol, (20010000), vol. 31, pages 3816 - 24 | - KUO et al., Infect Immun, (19950000), vol. 63, pages 2706 - 13 | - "Vaccine Adjuvants: Preparation Methods and Research Protocols", Methods in Molecular Medicine series, vol. 42 | - PODDADEL GIUDICE, Expert Rev Vaccines, (20030000), vol. 2, pages 219 - 229 | - NONY et al., Vaccine, (20010000), vol. 27, pages 3645 - 2680 | - STEINHAGEN et al., Vaccine, (20110000), vol. 29, pages 3341 - 6268 | - ROSENBERG et al., J Immunol, (20100000), vol. 184, no. 136.20 | - MYERS et al., Cellular and molecular aspects of endotoxin reactions, (19900000), pages 145 - 156 | - JOHNSON et al., J Med Chem, (19990000), vol. 42, pages 4640 - 9 | - BALDRICK et al., Regulatory Toxicol Pharmacol, (20020000), vol. 35, pages 398 - 413 | - JOHNSON et al., Bioorg Med Chem Lett, (19990000), vol. 9, pages 2273 - 2278 | - BAZIN et al., Tetrahedron Lett, (20060000), vol. 47, pages 2087 - 92 | - WONG et al., J Clin Pharmacol, (20030000), vol. 43, no. 7, pages 735 - 42 | - COLER et al., PLoS ONE, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 1, page e16333 | - GARQON et al., Expert Rev Vaccines, (20070000), vol. 6, pages 723 - 39 |